Wulf v. Illinois Mutual Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael Wulf
Defendant: Illinois Mutual Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01170
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 9/17/2019. All previously ordered dates are VACATED. Parties shall file a motion to dismiss or stipulation of dismissal within 30 days. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from Counsel for Defendant Illinois Mutual Life Insurance Company regarding Settlement. (Hittler, William)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)RULE 16 Scheduling Conference is RESCHEDULED for 10/24/2019 at 09:30 AM in By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(lh)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #6 Stipulation TO ADJOURN Rule 16 Conference, filed by Illinois Mutual Life Insurance Company, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 09/06/2019. The Scheduling Conference set for September 10, 2019 in this matter is continued for a period not less than 30 days to permit the parties the opportunity to resolve the case. The Clerk is directed to reschedule the conference. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Date for Scheduling Conference by Illinois Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Extending Date for Scheduling Conference)(Hittler, William)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Illinois Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Hittler, William)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Illinois Mutual Life Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hittler, William)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Illinois Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Hittler, William)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(mac)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Illinois Mutual Life Insurance Company from Waupaca, Case Number: 2019cv000196 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3188592) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Affidavit Declaration of William D. Hittler)(Hittler, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wulf v. Illinois Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wulf
Represented By: Ryan R Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William D Hittler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?