United States of America v. Spierings et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Bette C Ferg Irrevocable Income-Only Trust, Kaitlin M Spierings, Citizens State Bank of Loyal and Adam J Spierings
Case Number: 1:2019cv01182
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Crossclaim re #4 filed by Citizens State Bank of Loyal. (Kostka, Timothy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Citizens State Bank of Loyal.(Kostka, Timothy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L Kostka on behalf of Citizens State Bank of Loyal. Attorney(s) appearing: Timothy L. Kostka (Kostka, Timothy)
September 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to Adam J Spierings, Kaitlin M Spierings. (mac)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Stewart, Carter)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bette C Ferg Irrevocable Income-Only Trust - Waiver sent on 8/16/2019. (Stewart, Carter)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with CROSS-CLAIM and COUNTERCLAIM filed by Bette C Ferg Irrevocable Income-Only Trust . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Dreier, Gary) Modified on 8/29/2019 to reflect correct event (cav).
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L Dreier on behalf of Bette C Ferg Irrevocable Income-Only Trust. Attorney(s) appearing: Gary L. Dreier (Dreier, Gary)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Citizens State Bank of Loyal - Waiver sent on 8/16/2019. (Stewart, Carter)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (ds)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit C - Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit D 0 Promissory Note, #5 Exhibit E - Promissory Note, #6 Exhibit F - Promissory Note, #7 Exhibit G - Promissory Note, #8 Exhibit H - Promissory Note, #9 Exhibit I - Promissory Note, #10 Exhibit J - Promissory Note, #11 Exhibit K - Mortgage, #12 Exhibit L - Mortgage, #13 Exhibit M - Mortgage, #14 Exhibit N - Mortgage, #15 Exhibit O - Mortgage, #16 Exhibit P - Mortgage, #17 Exhibit Q - Mortgage, #18 Exhibit R - Notice of Acceleration, #19 Exhibit S - Statement of Account, #20 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stewart, Carter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Spierings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bette C Ferg Irrevocable Income-Only Trust
Represented By: Gary L Dreier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaitlin M Spierings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens State Bank of Loyal
Represented By: Timothy L Kostka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam J Spierings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carter Bryan Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?