Michaud v. Saul
Plaintiff: Claude Michaud
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M Saul and Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01245
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript and Preservation of Rights filed by Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Transcript, #2 Transcript, #3 Transcript, #4 Transcript, #5 Transcript, #6 Transcript, #7 Transcript, #8 Transcript, #9 Transcript, #10 Transcript, #11 Transcript, #12 Transcript, #13 Transcript, #14 Transcript, #15 Transcript, #16 Transcript, #17 Transcript, #18 Transcript, #19 Transcript, #20 Transcript, #21 Transcript, #22 Transcript, #23 Transcript, #24 Transcript, #25 Transcript, #26 Transcript, #27 Transcript) (Pawlak, Brian)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Andrew M Saul (Pawlak, Brian)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 9/4/2019. (blr)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/3/2019. (blr)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 10/29/2019 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 12/9/2019; defendant's response due 1/20/2020; plaintiff's reply due 2/4/2020. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
August 29, 2019 Transmit #1 Complaint and #5 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/28/2019 GRANTING #3 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Claude Michaud. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Duncan, Dana)
August 27, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Claude Michaud. (Duncan, Dana)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Claude Michaud. (Duncan, Dana)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Andrew M Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duncan, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michaud v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Michaud
Represented By: Dana W Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?