Cozzens et al v. Menasha Entertainment LLC
Plaintiff: Brenda Geiger, Kimberly Cozzens and Iesha Marie Crespo
Defendant: Menasha Entertainment LLC, Blue Sapphires, Blu Sapphires Gentlemen, Blu Sapphires Cabaret and Sapphires
Case Number: 1:2019cv01266
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Referring Judge: James R Sickel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge James R Sickel on 10/24/2019. The Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 09:20 AM is removed from the court calendar. Discovery due by 4/6/2020, Motions due by 7/27/2020; see Order for additional deadlines. (cc: all counsel)(Sickel, James)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEMPORARY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James R Sickel signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/16/19. (cc: all counsel)(lh)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Aronowitz, Edmund)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K Mullin on behalf of Menasha Entertainment LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel K. Mullin (Mullin, Daniel)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)RULE 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 09:20 AM in By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(cav)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Menasha Entertainment LLC.(Nichols, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T Nichols on behalf of Menasha Entertainment LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey T. Nichols (Nichols, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Aronowitz, Edmund)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(cav)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Aronowitz, Edmund)
September 3, 2019 Summons Issued as to Menasha Entertainment LLC. (cav)
September 3, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions (cav)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Aronowitz, Edmund)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Menasha Entertainment LLC by Kimberly Cozzens, Brenda Geiger, Iesha Marie Crespo. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3204291) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aronowitz, Edmund)
August 30, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cozzens et al v. Menasha Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menasha Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Daniel K Mullin
Represented By: Jeffrey T Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Sapphires
Represented By: Daniel K Mullin
Represented By: Jeffrey T Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blu Sapphires Gentlemen
Represented By: Daniel K Mullin
Represented By: Jeffrey T Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blu Sapphires Cabaret
Represented By: Daniel K Mullin
Represented By: Jeffrey T Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sapphires
Represented By: Daniel K Mullin
Represented By: Jeffrey T Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Geiger
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Cozzens
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iesha Marie Crespo
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?