Schettko v. Saul
Plaintiff: Joseph Schettko
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01283
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiffs brief due 12/23/2019; Defendants response due 1/31/2020; Plaintiffs reply due 2/18/2020. (cc: all counsel) (mac)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/10/2019. (mac)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 6, 2019 Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (lh)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 09/05/2019. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Joseph Schettko. (Duncan, Dana)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Joseph Schettko. (Duncan, Dana)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Joseph Schettko (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duncan, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schettko v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Schettko
Represented By: Dana W Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?