In the Matter of the Complaint of JF Brennan Company Inc
Plaintiff: J.F. Brennan Company, Inc. and JF Brennan Company Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01402
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by JF Brennan Company Inc Proof of Publication (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Green Bay Press)(Howard, Giles)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Complaint for Exoneration from, or Limitation of, Liability, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/10/2019. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING LETTER OF UNDERTAKING, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/10/2019. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by JF Brennan Company Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Howard, Giles)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Order Approving Security, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Suits Pursuant to Rule F by JF Brennan Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Approving Letter of Undertaking, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Suits, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Notice of Complaint for Exoneration from, or Limitation of, Liability)(Howard, Giles)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Ken Peterson in Support of Letter of Undertaking (Howard, Giles)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Letter of Undertaking BOND in the amount of $ 535,000 posted by JF Brennan Company Inc (Howard, Giles)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Giles B Howard on behalf of JF Brennan Company Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Giles B. Howard (Howard, Giles)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Settergren on behalf of JF Brennan Company Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Neal W. Settergren (Settergren, Neal)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Substitution by Robert Nienhuis on behalf of JF Brennan Company Inc. Additional Attorney(s) appearing: Neal W. Settergren; Attorney Richard Thomas to be termed. (Nienhuis, Robert)
September 26, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The cause of action chosen has been modified. The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (cav)
September 25, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by J.F. Brennan Company, Inc.. (Thomas, Richard)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Parties by J.F. Brennan Company, Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number BWIEDC-3229167) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of the Complaint of JF Brennan Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.F. Brennan Company, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JF Brennan Company Inc
Represented By: Richard J Thomas
Represented By: Giles B Howard
Represented By: Neal Settergren
Represented By: Robert Nienhuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?