Kreutzberg v. Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tracie R Kreutzberg
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01539
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 11/27/2019, Discovery due by 7/31/2020, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 2/14/2020, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 4/15/2020, Motions due by 8/28/2020, Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 12/13/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2020 01:30 PM before Judge William C Griesbach. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2021 08:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #112719) (cav) (Main Document 13 replaced on 12/3/2019 to correct year of jury trial to 2021) (cav). Modified hearing date on 12/4/2019 (lh).
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint , Standard Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Standard Insurance Company.(Herring, Jacqueline)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Tracie R Kreutzberg. (Covington, Brianna)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Standard Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Herring, Jacqueline)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, signed by Magistrate Judge James R Sickel on 10/23/2019. Standard Insurance Company's deadline to Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 11/25/2019. (cc: all counsel)(Sickel, James)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEMPORARY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James R Sickel signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/16/2019. (cc: all counsel)(cav)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Standard Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Additional Time for Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herring, Jacqueline)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2019 09:00 AM By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(cav)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Tracie R Kreutzberg. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Covington, Brianna)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Tracie R Kreutzberg. (Covington, Brianna)
October 22, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The jury demand has been modified - please remember to verify that a jury demand is included in the initiating document. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions for further guidance (cav)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Standard Insurance Company. (Herring, Jacqueline)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline J Herring on behalf of Standard Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Jacqueline J. Herring (Herring, Jacqueline)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Standard Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Brown County, Wisconsin, Case Number: 2019CV001206 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3254261) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herring, Jacqueline)
October 21, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kreutzberg v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacqueline J Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie R Kreutzberg
Represented By: Alan C Olson
Represented By: Brianna M Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?