Wash World Inc v. Belanger Inc et al
Plaintiff: Wash World Inc
Defendant: Piston OPW Inc, Dover Corporation and Belanger Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01562
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Piston OPW Inc - Waiver sent on 10/30/2019. (Coley, Sherry)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dover Corporation - Waiver sent on 10/30/2019. (Coley, Sherry)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Belanger Inc - Waiver sent on 10/30/2019. (Coley, Sherry)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Wash World Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Coley, Sherry)
October 25, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint, filed by Wash World Inc ; Attachments to documents should be clearly described. This document does not need to be re-filed. Please refer to Judge Griesbach's Instructions for Litigants found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
October 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to Belanger Inc, Dover Corporation, Piston OPW Inc. (lh)
October 24, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (Coley, Sherry)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Wash World Inc. (Coley, Sherry)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Wash World Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3258722) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Coley, Sherry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wash World Inc v. Belanger Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piston OPW Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belanger Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wash World Inc
Represented By: Sherry D Coley
Represented By: Tiffany E Woelfel
Represented By: Joseph S Heino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?