McDuffie et al v. City of Green Bay et al
Plaintiff: Ronella Williams, Ronnese Williams, Laronda Schaeffer and Carl McDuffie
Defendant: City of Green Bay, Officer Garth Russell, Officer Thomas Behn, Officer John/Jane Doe, Officer Paul Spoerl and Officer Michael Rahn
Case Number: 1:2019cv01611
Filed: November 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE Statement by Thomas Behn, City of Green Bay, Michael Rahn, Garth Russell, Paul Spoerl. (Wolfgang, John)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paul Spoerl - Waiver sent on 11/5/2019. (Wolfgang, John)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Garth Russell - Waiver sent on 11/5/2019. (Wolfgang, John)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Rahn - Waiver sent on 11/5/2019. (Wolfgang, John)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by City of Green Bay - Waiver sent on 11/5/2019. (Wolfgang, John)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Thomas Behn - Waiver sent on 11/5/2019. (Wolfgang, John)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John A Wolfgang on behalf of Thomas Behn, City of Green Bay, Michael Rahn, Garth Russell, Paul Spoerl. Attorney(s) appearing: John A. Wolfgang, Gregg J. Gunta, Ann C. Wirth and Jasmyne M. Baynard (Wolfgang, John)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmyne M Baynard on behalf of Thomas Behn, City of Green Bay, Michael Rahn, Garth Russell, Paul Spoerl. Attorney(s) appearing: Jasmyne M. Baynard, Gregg J. Gunta, John A. Wolfgang and Ann C. Wirth (Baynard, Jasmyne)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg J Gunta on behalf of Thomas Behn, City of Green Bay, Michael Rahn, Garth Russell, Paul Spoerl. Attorney(s) appearing: Gregg J. Gunta, John A. Wolfgang, Ann C. Wirth and Jasmyne M. Baynard (Gunta, Gregg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann C Wirth on behalf of Thomas Behn, City of Green Bay, Michael Rahn, Garth Russell, Paul Spoerl. Attorney(s) appearing: Ann C. Wirth, Gregg J. Gunta, John A. Wolfgang and Jasmyne M. Baynard (Wirth, Ann)
November 4, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #2 Request for Issuance of Summons filed by Carl McDuffie, Ronnese Williams, Laronda Schaeffer, Ronella Williams ; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
November 4, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The cause of action chosen has been modified. The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. The jury demand has been modified - please remember to verify that a jury demand is included in the initiating document. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (lh)
November 4, 2019 Summons Issued as to Thomas Behn, City of Green Bay, Michael Rahn, Garth Russell, Paul Spoerl. (lh)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons)(Stern, Walter)
November 4, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
November 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Thomas Behn, City of Green Bay, John/Jane Doe, Michael Rahn, Garth Russell, Paul Spoerl by Ronnese Williams, Ronella Williams, Carl McDuffie, Laronda Schaeffer. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3267111)(Stern, Walter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDuffie et al v. City of Green Bay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Green Bay
Represented By: Gregg J Gunta
Represented By: John A Wolfgang
Represented By: Ann C Wirth
Represented By: Jasmyne M Baynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Garth Russell
Represented By: Gregg J Gunta
Represented By: John A Wolfgang
Represented By: Ann C Wirth
Represented By: Jasmyne M Baynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Thomas Behn
Represented By: Gregg J Gunta
Represented By: John A Wolfgang
Represented By: Ann C Wirth
Represented By: Jasmyne M Baynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Paul Spoerl
Represented By: Gregg J Gunta
Represented By: John A Wolfgang
Represented By: Ann C Wirth
Represented By: Jasmyne M Baynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Michael Rahn
Represented By: Gregg J Gunta
Represented By: John A Wolfgang
Represented By: Ann C Wirth
Represented By: Jasmyne M Baynard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronella Williams
Represented By: Walter W Stern, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnese Williams
Represented By: Walter W Stern, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laronda Schaeffer
Represented By: Walter W Stern, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl McDuffie
Represented By: Walter W Stern, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?