Dixon Ticonderoga Company v. Krauchi
Plaintiff: Dixon Ticonderoga Company
Defendant: Willow Krauchi
Case Number: 1:2019cv01621
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Willow Krauchi - Waiver sent on 12/4/2019. (Muth, David)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dixon Ticonderoga Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Muth, David)
November 5, 2019 Summons Issued as to Willow Krauchi. (lh)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David P Muth on behalf of Dixon Ticonderoga Company. Attorney(s) appearing: David P. Muth (Muth, David)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Johanna M Wilbert on behalf of Dixon Ticonderoga Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Johanna M. Wilbert (Wilbert, Johanna)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (Wilbert, Johanna)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Dixon Ticonderoga Company. (Wilbert, Johanna)
November 4, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Willow Krauchi by Dixon Ticonderoga Company. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3268506) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reg. No. 5544976, #2 Exhibit B - 2018-11-23 Ltr to Pacon re Cease and Desist, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilbert, Johanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon Ticonderoga Company v. Krauchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dixon Ticonderoga Company
Represented By: Johanna M Wilbert
Represented By: David P Muth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willow Krauchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?