Truitt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael Christian Truitt
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv01672
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 11/26/2019. (blr)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/25/2019. (blr)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/25/2019. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Michael Christian Truitt. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Olinsky, Howard)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 1/20/2020 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 3/2/2020; defendant's response due 4/13/2020; plaintiff's reply due 4/28/2020. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
November 20, 2019 Transmit #1 Complaint and #4 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/19/2019 GRANTING #2 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
November 13, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Michael Christian Truitt. (Olinsky, Howard)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Michael Christian Truitt. (Olinsky, Howard)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Michael Christian Truitt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truitt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Christian Truitt
Represented By: Howard D Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?