Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London et al v. CNA International, Inc. a/k/a MCA Corporation a/k/a MC Appliance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company, Lloyds Syndicate 3624, Lloyds Syndicate 2007, Besse Forest Products Group Co and Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Guangdong Homa Appliances Co Ltd, CNA International Inc and Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Lead Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London
Case Number: 1:2019cv01753
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Pizzica, David)
January 20, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants.(Sanders, Maria)
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)RULE 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2020 09:00 AM By Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(cav)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CNA International Inc - Waiver sent on 12/5/2019. (Sanders, Maria)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria DelPizzo Sanders on behalf of CNA International Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Maria DelPizzo Sanders (Sanders, Maria)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria DelPizzo Sanders on behalf of Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Guangdong Homa Appliances Co Ltd. Attorney(s) appearing: Maria D. Sanders (Sanders, Maria)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Guangdong Homa Appliances Co Ltd - Waiver sent on 12/5/2019. (Sanders, Maria)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company - Waiver sent on 12/5/2019. (Sanders, Maria)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Christenson, Teirney)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David Pizzica on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: David B. Pizzica (Pizzica, David)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company. (Christenson, Teirney)
December 2, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (cav)
December 2, 2019 Summons Issued as to Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, CNA International Inc, Guangdong Homa Appliances Co Ltd. (cav)
December 2, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (bx)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. (Christenson, Teirney)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Christenson, Teirney)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Lloyds Syndicate 2007. (Christenson, Teirney)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Lloyds Syndicate 3624. (Christenson, Teirney)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Besse Forest Products Group Co., Lloyds Syndicate 2007, Lloyds Syndicate 3624, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3292671) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Christenson, Teirney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London et al v. CNA International, Inc. a/k/a MCA Corporation a/k/a MC Appliance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Teirney S Christenson
Represented By: David Pizzica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Teirney S Christenson
Represented By: David Pizzica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyds Syndicate 3624
Represented By: Teirney S Christenson
Represented By: David Pizzica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyds Syndicate 2007
Represented By: Teirney S Christenson
Represented By: David Pizzica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Besse Forest Products Group Co
Represented By: Teirney S Christenson
Represented By: David Pizzica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Teirney S Christenson
Represented By: David Pizzica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangdong Homa Appliances Co Ltd
Represented By: Maria DelPizzo Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA International Inc
Represented By: Maria DelPizzo Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Represented By: Maria DelPizzo Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London
Represented By: Teirney S Christenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?