The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Kamke et al
Defendant: Angela Cornette, Matthew Kamke, Jacob Kamke, Michael Kamke, Jr., M K and J K
Interpleader: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01889
Filed: December 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 2/27/2020 09:20 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 2/20/2020. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(tlf) Modified time on 1/27/2020 (mac).
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint AND CROSSCLAIM filed by Matthew Kamke. (Curry, Irving)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Prudential Insurance Company of America on Matthew Kamke (Pless, Erik) Modified on 1/9/2020 (cav).
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Prudential Insurance Company of America on Angela Cornette (Pless, Erik) Modified on 1/9/2020 (cav).
December 27, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cav)
December 27, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (cav)
December 27, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint,, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America ; Certain attachments to this document should have been filed as separate entries. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (cav)
December 26, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
December 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3314842) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Contract, #2 Exhibit B-Optional Certificate, #3 Exhibit C-Death Certificate, #4 Exhibit D-Matthew Claim Form, #5 Exhibit E-Email from Angela, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Rule 7.1 Statement(Pless, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Kamke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Erik J Pless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Cornette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Kamke
Represented By: Irving Gregg Curry, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Kamke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kamke, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M K
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J K
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?