Pundsack v. Credit Management Control Inc
Plaintiff: Douglas Pundsack
Defendant: Credit Management Control Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv00230
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Case dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) upon #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal.
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Douglas Pundsack. (Greene, Francis)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 DISREGARD WILL BE RE-FILED NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Douglas Pundsack. (Greene, Francis) Modified on 3/20/2020 (cmb).
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Pundsack. Credit Management Control Inc served on 2/28/2020. (Greene, Francis)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Douglas Pundsack. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Thomasson, Andrew)
February 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to Credit Management Control Inc. (cav)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T Thomasson on behalf of Douglas Pundsack. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew T. Thomasson (Thomasson, Andrew)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn Busby on behalf of Douglas Pundsack. Attorney(s) appearing: Katelyn B. Busby (Busby, Katelyn)
February 13, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Credit Management Control Inc by Douglas Pundsack. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number BWIEDC-3362644) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greene, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pundsack v. Credit Management Control Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Pundsack
Represented By: Francis R Greene
Represented By: Katelyn Busby
Represented By: Andrew T Thomasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Management Control Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?