BMO Harris Bank NA v. Berkovitz et al
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank NA
Defendant: Utility Trailer Sales of Georgia, General Trailer Services, Inc., Scott Berkovitz, Investors Community Bank, Ridgeway Trailer Company, Inc., Michael Chizek, M.R.C. Leasing Inc., General Trailer Services Inc, American National Bank, Chizek Elevator & Import, Ridgeway Trailer Company Inc and MRC Leasing Inc
Receiver: Seth E Dizard
Case Number: 1:2020cv00546
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Summons Issued as to American National Bank, Chizek Elevator & Import, Investors Community Bank as to Amended Complaint. (lh)
May 26, 2020 Filing 50 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by BMO Harris Bank NA (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Foley, Mark)
May 22, 2020 Filing 49 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Scott Berkovitz, Michael Chizek, Investors Community Bank, MRC Leasing Inc, American National Bank, Chizek Elevator & Import filed by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(mac)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #45 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, filed by BMO Harris Bank NA, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 05/22/2020. No opposition was filed, therefore the Clerk is directed to detach and e-file the Amended Complaint at [45-2]. Defendants' Answer is due June 11, 2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
May 15, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Michael Chizek re #27 MOTION to Dismiss . (Anderson, Brian)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ONLY ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to file any objection to #45 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint on or before Wednesday, May 20, 2020, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 05/15/2020. If no response is received by that time, the court will grant the motion. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
May 14, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Alfio Bottari Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Amended Complaint)(Foley, Mark) Modified on 5/14/2020 (mac).
May 13, 2020 Filing 44 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BMO Harris Bank NA re #27 MOTION to Dismiss . (Foley, Mark)
May 12, 2020 Defendant Ridgeway Trailer Company Inc terminated pursuant to #43 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (mac)
May 11, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Foley, Mark)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #41 Stipulation to extend to 5/11/2020 the time for Ridgeway Trailer Company Inc. to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 04/30/2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
April 29, 2020 Filing 41 STIPULATION Second Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint by Ridgeway Trailer Company Inc. (Killoran, Grant)
April 29, 2020 Filing 40 Amended NOTICE of Appearance by Ridgeway Trailer Company Inc. (Haskell, Jessica) Modified on 4/30/2020 (mac).
April 29, 2020 Filing 39 Amended NOTICE of Appearance by Ridgeway Trailer Company Inc. (Killoran, Grant) Modified on 4/30/2020 (mac).
April 29, 2020 Party Investors Community Bank terminated upon the #38 Notice of Party Dismissal filed by Plaintiff. (lh)
April 29, 2020 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #38 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by BMO Harris Bank NA ; The incorrect event was chosen; This document does NOT need to be refiled. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
April 28, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Dismissal of Party Investors Community Bank by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Koehnke, Christopher) Modified event and text on 4/29/2020 (lh).
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #31 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel filed by Ridgeway Trailer Company Inc.; APPROVING #32 Stipulation Extending to May 1, 2020 Investors Community Bank's time to Answer; and APPROVING #36 Stipulation Extending to May 1, 2020 Ridgeway Trailer Company Inc.'s time to Answer; signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 04/24/2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
April 24, 2020 Filing 36 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint by Ridgeway Trailer Company Inc. (Killoran, Grant)
April 23, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica K Haskell on behalf of Ridgeway Trailer Company Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Jessica Haskell (Haskell, Jessica)
April 23, 2020 Filing 34 LETTER from Attorney Heather Nelson re: possible stipulated dismissal of Michael Chizek, individually. (Nelson, Heather)
April 23, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant C Killoran on behalf of Ridgeway Trailer Company Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Grant C. Killoran (Killoran, Grant)
April 23, 2020 Filing 32 STIPULATION To Extend Investors Community Bank's Deadline to Answer the Complaint to May 1, 2020 by Investors Community Bank. (Van Lieshout, David)
April 23, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by Ridgeway Trailer Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Substitution of Counsel)(Killoran, Grant)
April 22, 2020 Filing 30 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Michael Chizek, MRC Leasing Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Anderson, Brian)
April 22, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Michael Chizek, MRC Leasing Inc.(Anderson, Brian)
April 22, 2020 Filing 28 BRIEF in Support filed by Michael Chizek, MRC Leasing Inc re #27 MOTION to Dismiss . (Anderson, Brian)
April 22, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Chizek. (Anderson, Brian)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 04/21/2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
April 20, 2020 Filing 25 PROPOSED Stipulated Protective Order filed by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Foley, Mark)
April 16, 2020 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #24 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by BMO Harris Bank NA ; The incorrect event was chosen; There is no need to refile the document. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
April 16, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Dismissal without prejudice by BMO Harris Bank NA of Party General Trailer Services Inc and Utility Trailer Sales of Georgia terminated. (Koehnke, Christopher) Modified event text on 4/16/2020 (lh).
April 15, 2020 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE Statement by MRC Leasing Inc. (Anderson, Brian)
April 15, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D Anderson on behalf of Michael Chizek, MRC Leasing Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Brian D. Anderson (Anderson, Brian)
April 15, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather L Nelson on behalf of Michael Chizek, MRC Leasing Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Heather L. Nelson (Nelson, Heather)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #17 Stipulation, filed by BMO Harris Bank NA. Defendant Investors Community Bank is joined as a party subject to this courts Order Granting Limited Discovery. Dkt. 10. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
April 13, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T Koehnke on behalf of BMO Harris Bank NA. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher T. Koehnke (Koehnke, Christopher)
April 13, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BMO Harris Bank NA (Foley, Mark)
April 13, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Join Defendant Investors Community Bank to Order Granting Expedited Discovery Pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civil Proc. 26(d), 27 and Civil L.R. 7(h) by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Foley, Mark)
April 13, 2020 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by BMO Harris Bank NA. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Foley, Mark)
April 13, 2020 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #15 Notice of Appearance filed by Investors Community Bank ; Electronically filed documents should not be scanned whenever possible. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
April 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Van Lieshout on behalf of Investors Community Bank. Attorney(s) appearing: David J. Van Lieshout (Van Lieshout, David)
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BMO Harris Bank NA (Foley, Mark)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BMO Harris Bank NA (Foley, Mark)
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul G Swanson on behalf of Ridgeway Trailer Company Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Paul G. Swanson (Swanson, Paul) (Main Document 12 replaced on 4/10/2020 with signed version) (mac).
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 4/8/2020 GRANTING #9 Motion for Order Granting Limited Discovery. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of John Roh in Support of Plaintiff's Expedited Motion for Order Granting Expedited Discovery Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(d), 27 and Civil L.R. 7(h). (Foley, Mark)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 Expedited MOTION for Order Granting Expedited Discovery Pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civil Proc. 26(d), 27 and Civil L.R. 7(h) by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Foley, Mark)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by BMO Harris Bank NA as to General Trailer Services Inc. (Foley, Mark)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank NA. Utility Trailer Sales of Georgia served on 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service at 2nd location)(Foley, Mark)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by BMO Harris Bank NA as to Scott Berkovitz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Non Service of Summons)(Foley, Mark)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank NA. Michael Chizek served on 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Summons)(Foley, Mark)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank NA. MRC Leasing Inc served on 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of Summons)(Foley, Mark)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank NA. Ridgeway Trailer Company Inc served on 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service of Summons)(Foley, Mark)
April 6, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mac)
April 3, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (bx) Modified on 4/3/2020 (bx).
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by BMO Harris Bank NA. (Foley, Mark)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by BMO Harris Bank NA. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3412471) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Foley, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank NA v. Berkovitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utility Trailer Sales of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Trailer Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Berkovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investors Community Bank
Represented By: David J Van Lieshout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ridgeway Trailer Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Chizek
Represented By: Heather L Nelson
Represented By: Brian D Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.R.C. Leasing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Trailer Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chizek Elevator & Import
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ridgeway Trailer Company Inc
Represented By: Paul G Swanson
Represented By: Grant C Killoran
Represented By: Jessica K Haskell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRC Leasing Inc
Represented By: Heather L Nelson
Represented By: Brian D Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank NA
Represented By: Mark F Foley
Represented By: Christopher T Koehnke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Seth E Dizard
Represented By: Grant C Killoran
Represented By: Jessica K Haskell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?