Heat & Frost Insulators Local 19 and 127 Health Fund et al v. Life Safety Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Heat & Frost Insulators Local 127 Annuity Fund, Heat & Frost Insulators Local 127 Apprenticeship Fund, Heat & Frost Insulators Local 19 and 127 Health Fund, Heat & Frost Insulators Local 127, Heat & Frost Insulators 127 Industry and Labor Management Fund, Heat & Frost Insulators Local 127 Pension Fund and Heat Frost Insulators Local 127 Vacation and Holiday Fund
Defendant: Life Safety Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01226
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/8/2020 denying #3 Motion for Default Judgment. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
October 2, 2020 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Life Safety Systems, Inc. (mac)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Yingtao Ho (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Collection Letter, #3 Exhibit Costs)(Ho, Yingtao)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Marilyn Zurakov (Ho, Yingtao)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Jeremy Wicke (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Understanding)(Ho, Yingtao)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #3 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Life Safety Systems . (Ho, Yingtao)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Life Safety Systems by All Plaintiffs. (Ho, Yingtao)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST by All Plaintiffs for Clerk's Entry of Default. (Attachments: #1 Envelope WI Dept. of Finanical Inst., #2 Envelope Affidavit of Reasonabe Diligence)(Ho, Yingtao)
August 11, 2020 Summons Issued as to Life Safety Systems, Inc. (tlf)
August 10, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Safety Systems, Inc. by Heat & Frost Insulators Local 127 Annuity Fund, Heat & Frost Insulators 127 Industry and Labor Management Fund, Heat & Frost Insulators Local 127, Heat & Frost Insulators Local 127 Apprenticeship Fund, Heat Frost Insulators Local 127 Vacation and Holiday Fund, Heat & Frost Insulators Local 19 and 127 Health Fund, Heat & Frost Insulators Local 127 Pension Fund. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3535136) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ho, Yingtao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heat & Frost Insulators Local 19 and 127 Health Fund et al v. Life Safety Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heat & Frost Insulators Local 127 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heat & Frost Insulators Local 127 Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heat & Frost Insulators Local 19 and 127 Health Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heat & Frost Insulators Local 127
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heat & Frost Insulators 127 Industry and Labor Management Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heat & Frost Insulators Local 127 Pension Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heat Frost Insulators Local 127 Vacation and Holiday Fund
Represented By: Yingtao Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Safety Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?