Beckman v. DeJoy
Plaintiff: Russell Beckman
Defendant: Louis DeJoy
Case Number: 1:2020cv01259
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 39:409
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 9/28/2020 granting #5 Motion to Dismiss; denying #5 Motion for reimbursement of the court filing fee. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Beckman) (Griesbach, William)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support filed by Russell Beckman re #5 MOTION to Dismiss this action and MOTION for Order directing reimbursement of the court filing fee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(tlf)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss this action and MOTION for Order directing reimbursement of the court filing fee by Russell Beckman. (tlf)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE regarding service by Russell Beckman (cav)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E Pawlak on behalf of Louis DeJoy. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Brian E. Pawlak (Pawlak, Brian)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Russell Beckman. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cav)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT and REQUEST for Injunction against Louis DeJoy filed by Russell Beckman. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (Filing Fee PAID ;GB4689-5720) (Service Packet Issued) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6)(cav)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beckman v. DeJoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Beckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis DeJoy
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?