Ponfil v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Leila M. Ponfil and Leila M Ponfil
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv01272
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 8/31/2020. (blr)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Skutch Cohn on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney(s) appearing: Emily S. Cohn (Cohn, Emily)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/4/2020. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Leila M Ponfil. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Olinsky, Howard)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 10/26/2020 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 12/7/2020; defendant's response due 1/18/2021; plaintiff's reply due 2/2/2021. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
August 24, 2020 Transmit #1 Complaint and #4 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/20/2020 GRANTING #2 plaintiff's motion to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 19, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Leila M. Ponfil. (Olinsky, Howard)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Leila M. Ponfil. (Olinsky, Howard)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Leila M. Ponfil (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponfil v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Emily Skutch Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leila M. Ponfil
Represented By: Howard D Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leila M Ponfil
Represented By: Howard D Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?