Roberts v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Patricia Roberts
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv01339
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/24/2020. (cav)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 Briefing Letter transmitted to the parties: Administrative Record due 11/23/2020; Plaintiffs brief due 12/31/2020; Defendants response due 2/9/2021; Plaintiffs reply due 2/24/2021. (cc: all counsel and via U.S. Mail to Patricia Roberts) (tlf)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 9/17/2020. (lh)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Patricia Roberts. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (blr)
September 11, 2020 Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (mac)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 9/11/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Roberts) (Griesbach, William)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (blr)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Patricia Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Second IFP)(blr)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Patricia Roberts (Social Security Form). (Attachments: #1 Complaint (Standard Form))(blr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?