Clark v. Saul
Plaintiff: Stephanie Clark
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv01363
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on September 21, 2020. (amb)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on September 21, 2020. (amb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C Hugo on behalf of Andrew Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Megan C. Hugo (Hugo, Megan)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiff's brief due December 28, 2020; Defendant's response due February 8, 2021; Plaintiff's reply due February 23, 2021. (cc: all counsel) (blr)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/18/2020. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 17, 2020 Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (asc)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/15/2020 GRANTING #6 plaintiff's amended motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fee by Stephanie Clark. (Duncan, Dana) Modified text and event on 9/15/2020 (blr).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/11/2020. By 9/25/2020 plaintiff to file amended request to proceed without prepayment of filing fee. Failure to file by deadline will result in denial of request and requirement to pay filing fee in full. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Stephanie Clark. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Duncan, Dana)
September 3, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Stephanie Clark. (Duncan, Dana)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Stephanie Clark. (Duncan, Dana)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Stephanie Clark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duncan, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Megan C Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Clark
Represented By: Dana W Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?