Jaimes v. Saul
Plaintiff: Nora Jaimes
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv01372
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Judy Tsui on behalf of Andrew M Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Judy Tsui (Tsui, Judy)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/16/20. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge Lynn Adelman no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiffs brief due 12/19/20; Defendants response due 1/28/21; Plaintiffs reply due 2/13/21. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Service Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; by Nora Jaimes Defendants served on 9/11/2020. (Brzezinski, James) Modified on 9/11/2020 (blr).
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Nora Jaimes. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Brzezinski, James)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Nora Jaimes. (Brzezinski, James)
September 4, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Nora Jaimes ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3561854) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brzezinski, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaimes v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Jaimes
Represented By: James M Brzezinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Judy Tsui
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?