Maples v. Saul
Plaintiff: Stuart M Maples
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv01374
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiff's brief due January 4, 2021; Defendant's response due February 16, 2021; Plaintiff's reply due March 3, 2021. (cc: all counsel) (amb)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 9/24/2020. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Stuart M Maples. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Geary, Timothy)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stuart M Maples (Geary, Timothy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 8, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions for further guidance. (blr)
September 4, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Stuart M Maples. (Geary, Timothy)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Stuart M Maples ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3562366) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit ALJ Decision, #3 Exhibit Appeals Council Denial)(Geary, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maples v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart M Maples
Represented By: Timothy P Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?