Pollard v. Nikolai et al
Plaintiff: Fredderick T Pollard and Freddrick T Pollard
Defendant: Kim Nikolai, Terrence Jaeger, Dr Labby Kira, Angela Thompson, Bultz, Jason McHugh and Tom Larson
Case Number: 1:2020cv01868
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 Report from plaintiff pertaining to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. (cmb)
January 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE to correct spelling of plaintiff's name by Freddrick T Pollard (name corrected on docket) (lh)
January 21, 2021 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $43.14, receipt number GB4689-5797. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (lh)
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Fredderick T Pollard. (cmb).
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that on or before 2/5/2021 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 43.14 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 1/5/2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party and Warden)(Griesbach, William)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Fredderick T Pollard. (blr)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Fredderick T Pollard. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (blr)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. Mailed (cmb)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Fredderick T Pollard. (cmb)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against All Defendants by Fredderick T Pollard. (cmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollard v. Nikolai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredderick T Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddrick T Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Nikolai
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Labby Kira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?