Sanders v. Milwaukee County Jail
Plaintiff: Thomas Elley Sanders
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail
Case Number: 1:2021cv00083
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $2.34, receipt number GB4689-005812; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (tlf)
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Thomas Sanders regarding Initial Partial Filing Fee. (mac)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that on or before 3/1/2021 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $2.34 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. Signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 1/28/2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party, Sheriff and Dennis Brand)(Griesbach, William)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Thomas Elley Sanders. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Mailed. (cmb)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Thomas Elley Sanders. (cmb)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Thomas Elley Sanders. (cmb)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against Milwaukee County Jail by Thomas Elley Sanders. (cmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Milwaukee County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555, 2241
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Elley Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?