Brown v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gregory P Brown
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00633
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #18 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to July 30, 2021, to respond to counterclaims, filed by Gregory P. Brown, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 07/08/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
July 7, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaims by Gregory P Brown. (Maynard, Timothy)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 7/2/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
July 1, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 7/1/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2021, Discovery due by 3/31/2022, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 5/27/2022, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 7/29/2022, Motions due by 11/11/2022, Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 7/30/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2023 01:30 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach., Jury Trial set for 4/10/2023 08:30 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #070121) (mac)
June 25, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against Gregory P. Brown filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company , Aetna Life Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Counterclaims. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Group Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Reimbursement Agreement)(von Schleicher, Warren)
June 24, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION MOTION to Dismiss Party Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (von Schleicher, Warren) Modified on 6/24/2021 (tlf).
June 24, 2021 Filing 13 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (von Schleicher, Warren)
June 24, 2021 Party Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company dismissed without prejudice upon the #14 Stipulation of the parties. (tlf)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (von Schleicher, Warren)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to 6/25/2021 to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Aetna Life Insurance Company, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 05/26/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
May 25, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(von Schleicher, Warren)
May 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2021 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 6/24/2021. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Gregory P Brown. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Maynard, Timothy)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (von Schleicher, Warren)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (von Schleicher, Warren)
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline J Herring on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Jacqueline J. Herring (Herring, Jacqueline)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline J Herring on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Jacqueline J. Herring (Herring, Jacqueline)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren von Schleicher on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Warren Sebastian von Schleicher (von Schleicher, Warren)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren von Schleicher on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Warren Sebastian von Schleicher (von Schleicher, Warren)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Aetna Life Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Outagamie County, Wisconsin, Case Number: 2021CV000308 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3824407) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - 11/17/16 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(von Schleicher, Warren)
May 21, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Warren von Schleicher
Represented By: Jacqueline J Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Warren von Schleicher
Represented By: Jacqueline J Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory P Brown
Represented By: Timothy P Maynard
Represented By: Gregory P Stratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?