Moxon et al v. Walmart Inc et al
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin Dept of Health Services, UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc and Renee G Moxon
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA and Walmart Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv00676
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 7/8/2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(Griesbach, William)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 7/8/2021. Initial Disclosures due 7/28/21, Amended Pleadings due 7/30/21, Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures due 9/30/21, Defendant's Expert Disclosures due 1/7/22, Discovery due 2/11/22, Dispositive Motions due 4/15/22. (Tape #070821) (lh)
July 8, 2021 Copy of Minutes Scheduling Conference, #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Renee Moxon (lh)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, Walmart Inc. (Andrews, Eric)
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER from Jenna N Ashbeck advising that her representation of plaintiff, Renee Moxon, terminated on 6/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order Permitting Withdrawal of Attorney)(tlf)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, Walmart Inc.(Andrews, Eric)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2021 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 7/1/2021. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel and via U.S. Mail to Renee G Moxon)(tlf)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, Walmart Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Andrews, Eric)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. (Andrews, Eric)
June 1, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Walmart Inc. (Andrews, Eric)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER to Jenna Ashbeck regarding ECF registration and admission ( sent via USPS)(jcl) Note: Attorney Ashbeck filed a notice of limited representation and a notice terminating that limited representation in Winnebago County Circuit Court. (tlf).
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA from Winnebago County Circuit Court, Case Number: 21-CV-258 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3832432) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Service of Process Transmittal of Walmart Inc, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Service of National Union Fire Insurance, #4 Exhibit 4 - Limited Appearance of Counsel on Behalf of Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Counsel, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Eric)
June 1, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moxon et al v. Walmart Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Represented By: Eric L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Eric L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin Dept of Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee G Moxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?