NCMIC Insurance Company v. Johnson, D.C. et al
Plaintiff: NCMIC Insurance Company
Defendant: Kristyn Nelson-Juidici, Optimal Health Sanexus, Apple Medical Clinic, Inc., Michael Johnson, D.C. and Optimal Stem Cell and Wellness Institute
Case Number: 1:2021cv00715
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference rescheduled to 9/1/2021 01:30 PM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 8/25/2021. See #14 Notice for additional information. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(tlf)
August 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2021 10:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 8/27/2021. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Apple Medical Clinic, Inc., Michael Johnson, D.C., Optimal Health Sanexus, Optimal Stem Cell and Wellness Institute.(Guse, Randall)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #11 Stipulation extending time to August 2, 2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Apple Medical Clinic, Inc., Optimal Health Sanexus, Michael Johnson, D.C., and Optimal Stem Cell and Wellness Institute, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 07/27/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
July 26, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Complaint by Apple Medical Clinic, Inc., Michael Johnson, D.C., Optimal Health Sanexus, Optimal Stem Cell and Wellness Institute. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guse, Randall)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCMIC Insurance Company. Michael Johnson, D.C. served on 7/8/2021. (Kuderer, Robert)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCMIC Insurance Company. Optimal Stem Cell and Wellness Institute served on 7/8/2021. (Kuderer, Robert)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCMIC Insurance Company. Optimal Health Sanexus served on 7/8/2021. (Kuderer, Robert)
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by NCMIC Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kuderer, Robert)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Approving #5 Stipulation and extending the time for Defendants Cell and Wellness Institute, Apple Medical Clinic, Inc., Michael Johnson, D.C., Optimal Health Sanexus, and Optimal Stem Cell and Wellness Institute to respond to Plaintiff's complaint to 7/23/2021. Signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 7/14/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Apple Medical Clinic, Inc., Michael Johnson, D.C., Optimal Health Sanexus, Optimal Stem Cell and Wellness Institute. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Time for Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint)(Guse, Randall)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall R Guse on behalf of Apple Medical Clinic, Inc., Michael Johnson, D.C., Optimal Health Sanexus, Optimal Stem Cell and Wellness Institute. Attorney(s) appearing: Randall R. Guse (Guse, Randall)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCMIC Insurance Company. Apple Medical Clinic, Inc. served on 6/22/2021. (Kuderer, Robert)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NCMIC Insurance Company. Kristyn Nelson-Juidici served on 6/21/2021. (Kuderer, Robert)
June 11, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mac)
June 10, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by NCMIC Insurance Company. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3841933) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Reservation of Rights Letter, #3 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - Policy, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Kuderer, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NCMIC Insurance Company v. Johnson, D.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristyn Nelson-Juidici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optimal Health Sanexus
Represented By: Randall R Guse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Medical Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: Randall R Guse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Johnson, D.C.
Represented By: Randall R Guse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optimal Stem Cell and Wellness Institute
Represented By: Randall R Guse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NCMIC Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E Kuderer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?