Leitermann et al v. Forefront Dermatology SC et al
Plaintiff: Judith Leitermann and Lynn Anderson
Defendant: Forefront Dermatology SC and Forefront Management LLC
Consolidated Plaintiff: Milan E Kunzelmann, Jeanette Alonso and Christopher Ian Pryby
Case Number: 1:2021cv00887
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2023 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher Ian Pryby (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bx)
January 27, 2023 Filing 67 OBJECTIONS by Christopher Ian Pryby re #61 Motion for Attorney Fees,,. (bx)
January 27, 2023 Filing 66 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Christopher Ian Pryby re #61 Motion for Attorney Fees #62 MOTION for Order. (bx) Modified on 1/30/2023 (bx).
January 27, 2023 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Christopher Ian Pryby Supporting Motion for Permission to Use ECF (bx)
January 27, 2023 Filing 64 DISCLOSURE Statement by Christopher Ian Pryby. (bx)
January 27, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Ian Pryby. (bx)
January 27, 2023 Filing 62 MOTION for Permission to Use ECF filed by Christopher Ian Pryby (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bx)
January 4, 2023 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #61 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards for Class Representatives filed by Judith Leitermann, Lynn Anderson, Milan E Kunzelmann ; The Brief in Support and Declarations (attachments) to this document should have been filed as separate entries using specific events such as Brief in Support and Declaration. This/these document(s) does not need to be re-filed; In the future, please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx)
January 3, 2023 Filing 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards for Class Representatives by Lynn Anderson, Milan E Kunzelmann, Judith Leitermann. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards for Class Representatives, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Andrew W. Ferich in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards for Class Representatives, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Gary M. Klinger in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, Expenses, and Service Awards for Class Representatives)(Klinger, Gary)
January 3, 2023 Filing 60 LETTER from Nancy Milford re settlement. (bx)
December 14, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE by Lynn Anderson, Milan E Kunzelmann, Judith Leitermann Notice of Errata (Ferich, Andrew)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/3/22 re #56 MOTION for Settlement. Fairness Hearing set for 3/1/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 390, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Judge Lynn Adelman. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
September 1, 2022 Filing 57 BRIEF in Support filed by Lynn Anderson, Milan E Kunzelmann, Judith Leitermann re #56 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Tina Wolfson, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Gary M. Klinger, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Brandon Schwartz, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Robert Siciliano, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferich, Andrew)
September 1, 2022 Filing 56 MOTION for Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement by Lynn Anderson, Milan E Kunzelmann, Judith Leitermann. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferich, Andrew)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/24/22 Approving Stipulation re #54 Stipulation to Continue Deadline to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
August 22, 2022 Filing 54 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Forefront Dermatology SC, Forefront Management LLC. (Collignon, Casie)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/12/22 Approving Stipulation re #52 JOINT STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Plaintiffs shall file on or before August 22, 2022, their Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
August 11, 2022 Filing 52 JOINT STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Lynn Anderson, Milan E Kunzelmann, Judith Leitermann. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferich, Andrew)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/1/22 GRANTING #50 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Plaintiffs shall file on or before August 12, 2022, their Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
July 25, 2022 Filing 50 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Lynn Anderson, Milan E Kunzelmann, Judith Leitermann. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferich, Andrew)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Approving Stipulation signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/1/22 re #48 Stipulation, filed by Forefront Management LLC, Forefront Dermatology SC. The Stipulation is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file on or before July 31, 2022 their Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. All other deadlines in the case are VACATED. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
June 30, 2022 Filing 48 STIPULATION TO SET DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND VACATE ALL OTHER DEADLINES by Forefront Dermatology SC, Forefront Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Collignon, Casie)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/22/22 GRANTING #46 Stipulation to Amend Plaintiffs' Responsive Pleading Deadline and Briefing Schedule on Same. Deadline for Plaintiffs to file their opposition to Forefront's responsive pleading: July 8, 2022. Deadline for Forefront to file its reply in support of its responsive pleading: July 22, 2022. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
June 21, 2022 Filing 46 STIPULATION Stipulation to Amend Plaintiffs' Responsive Pleading Deadline and Briefing Schedule on Same by Lynn Anderson, Milan E Kunzelmann, Judith Leitermann. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferich, Andrew)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/26/22. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/26/22. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
May 23, 2022 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #43 Stipulated Proposed Order filed by Forefront Management LLC, Forefront Dermatology SC ; The proposed order should be filed as an attachment to the stipulation. Please ensure that the proposed order has been emailed to the proposed email box for the assigned judge in Word format. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl)
May 23, 2022 Filing 43 PROPOSED STIPULATED PROPOSED ORDER filed by All Defendants. (Collignon, Casie)
May 10, 2022 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #42 MOTION to Dismiss CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) filed by Forefront Management LLC, Forefront Dermatology SC ; The Brief in Support to this document should have been filed as a separate entry. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl)
May 10, 2022 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #2 Exh. A - Notice of Privacy Practices, #3 Exh. B - Privacy Policy)(Collignon, Casie)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/20/22 granting #40 Stipulation filed by Forefront Management LLC, Forefront Dermatology SC. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
April 19, 2022 Filing 40 STIPULATION TO RESET DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON SAME by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Collignon, Casie)
April 18, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gary M Klinger (Klinger, Gary)
April 18, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Lietz (Lietz, David)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 03/30/2022; Granting #36 Stipulation To Continue Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline and Briefing Schedule on Same. (cc: all counsel)(bx)
March 29, 2022 Filing 36 STIPULATION to Continue Defendants Responsive Pleading Deadline & Briefing Schedule On Same by Forefront Dermatology SC, Forefront Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Collignon, Casie) Modified on 3/30/2022 (jcl).
February 28, 2022 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint with Jury Demand against Forefront Dermatology SC, Forefront Management LLC filed by Milan E Kunzelmann, Lynn Anderson, Judith Leitermann.(Wolfson, Tina)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting Amended Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/27/22. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/28/22 that the motion for appointment of interim class counsel filed by the Klinger-Wolfson Group #18 is GRANTED. The competing interim lead-counsel motion of the Hartley Group #22 is DENIED. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
January 26, 2022 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Status Conference held on 1/26/2022. Parties report on case status and provide further argument regarding lead counsel motion. Court to issue written order on lead counsel motion. (jad)
January 18, 2022 Filing 31 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Status Conference held on 1/18/2022. Court and parties discuss interim lead counsel motions and related matters. Court grants motion to consolidate Alonso matter with the prior cases #21 . Court denies motion to strike #25 Alonso's lead-counsel motion. Candidates for interim lead counsel, including counsel for Alonso, agree to discuss possible joint leadership structure. Telephonic status conference set for January 26, 2022 at 10:30 am CST. Participants need to call in for the conference as follows: dial access number 1-877-336-1839. You will be prompted for an access code (4144803) and a security code (1234). Once that information is entered participants will be placed on hold until we access the call. Counsel must email the court prior to the call at AdelmanPO@wied.uscourts.gov to provide the names of attorneys appearing. (jad)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/12/22. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic status conference will be held on January 18, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Participants need to call in for the conference as follows: dial access number 1-877-336-1839. You will be prompted for an access code (4144803) and a security code (1234). Once that information is entered participants will be placed on hold until we access the call. Counsel must email the court prior to the call at AdelmanPO@wied.uscourts.gov to provide the names of attorneys appearing. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
December 7, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Lynn Anderson, Milan E Kunzelmann, Judith Leitermann re #25 MOTION to Strike Non-Party Jeanette Alonso's Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Class Counsel and Interim Liaison Counsel (ECF No. 22) Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Non-Party Jeanette Alonso's Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Class Counsel and Interim Liaison Counsel. (Wolfson, Tina)
November 24, 2021 Filing 28 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Jeanette Alonso re #25 MOTION to Strike Non-Party Jeanette Alonso's Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Class Counsel and Interim Liaison Counsel (ECF No. 22) . (Manion, Shauna)
November 24, 2021 Filing 27 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Jeanette Alonso re #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . (Manion, Shauna)
November 19, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Forefront Dermatology SC, Forefront Management LLC re #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Opposition). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Prior Case Opposition to Motion to Consolidate)(Collignon, Casie)
November 12, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Strike Non-Party Jeanette Alonso's Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Class Counsel and Interim Liaison Counsel (ECF No. 22) by Lynn Anderson, Milan E Kunzelmann, Judith Leitermann. (Klinger, Gary)
November 12, 2021 Filing 24 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Lynn Anderson, Milan E Kunzelmann, Judith Leitermann re #22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . (Klinger, Gary)
November 12, 2021 Filing 23 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Lynn Anderson, Milan E Kunzelmann, Judith Leitermann re #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . (Klinger, Gary)
November 2, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jeanette Alonso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Hartley Resume, #2 Exhibit B Heins Resume, #3 Exhibit C Mallery Resume, #4 Exhibit D Tadler Resume, #5 Proposed Order)(Manion, Shauna)
November 2, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Jeanette Alonso. (Manion, Shauna)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/21/21 granting #19 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
September 7, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Unopposed) by Judith Leitermann. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klinger, Gary)
September 2, 2021 Filing 18 Amended MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Interim) Under Fed. R Civ. P. 23(g)(3) by Lynn Anderson, Judith Leitermann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declarataion of Stephen R. Basser), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klinger, Gary)
August 30, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
August 27, 2021 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Forefront Dermatology SC, Forefront Management LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Collignon, Casie)
August 24, 2021 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Lynn Anderson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Blythin, John)
August 23, 2021 Filing 15 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Judith Leitermann. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Klinger, Gary)
August 20, 2021 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE Statement by Forefront Dermatology SC, Forefront Management LLC. (Collignon, Casie)
August 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Forefront Dermatology SC, Forefront Management LLC of Related Case (Collignon, Casie)
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Casie D Collignon on behalf of Forefront Dermatology SC, Forefront Management LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Casie D. Collignon (Collignon, Casie)
August 20, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF; Lynn Anderson requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (asc)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to consolidate (Case No. 21-CV-887, Docket # 9; Case No. 21-CV-891, Docket # 10) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Case No. 21-CV-891 is consolidated under Case No. 21-CV-887. All future filings related to Case No. 21-CV-891 must be filed in Case No. 21-CV-887. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Amended Complaint no later than thirty (30) days following the entry of an order appointing interim class counsel or other designated counsel. (cc: all counsel)(asc)
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(3) by Judith Leitermann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Appoint Interim Lead Counsel (Declaration of Gary M. Klinger), #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Gary M. Klinger (MLK Firm Resume), #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Gary M. Klinger (Hearing Transcript), #4 Exhibit B to Motion to Appoint Interim Lead Counsel (Declaration of Tina Wolfson), #5 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tina Wolfson (AW Firm Resume), #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Klinger, Gary)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Unopposed) by Judith Leitermann. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klinger, Gary)
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M Klinger on behalf of Judith Leitermann. Attorney(s) appearing: Gary M. Klinger (Klinger, Gary)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lietz on behalf of Judith Leitermann. Attorney(s) appearing: David K. Lietz (Lietz, David)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; Waiver mailed on 8/5/2021 as to Forefront Dermatology, SC. (Goode, Joseph) Modified on 8/10/2021 (asc).
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; Waiver mailed on 8/5/2021 as to Forefront Management, LLC (Goode, Joseph) Modified on 8/10/2021 (asc).
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 8/6/2021. Judge William C Griesbach recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
August 6, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (asc)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 ATTACHMENTS - Exhibit A to Complaint - Notice of Data Security Incident by Judith Leitermann re #1 Complaint. (Halpin, John)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR. WRONG CASE. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 7/29/2021. Telephone Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2022 01:30 PM in By Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. Jury Trial set for 1/31/2022 08:30 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #072821) (lh) Modified as error on 7/29/2021 (lh).
July 29, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
July 29, 2021 Summons Issued as to Forefront Dermatology SC, Forefront Management LLC. (lh)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Judith Leitermann. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number BWIEDC-3880151) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Goode, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leitermann et al v. Forefront Dermatology SC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Leitermann
Represented By: Joseph S Goode
Represented By: David Lietz
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: John W Halpin
Represented By: Andrew W Ferich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Andrew W Ferich
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Robert R Ahdoot
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forefront Dermatology SC
Represented By: Casie D Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forefront Management LLC
Represented By: Casie D Collignon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Milan E Kunzelmann
Represented By: Samuel M Ward
Represented By: Stephen R Basser
Represented By: Andrew W Ferich
Represented By: Gary M Klinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jeanette Alonso
Represented By: Shauna D Manion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Christopher Ian Pryby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?