Van Dynhoven v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Laura Van Dynhoven and Laura B Van Dynhoven
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv00948
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Skutch Cohn on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. Attorney(s) appearing: Emily S. Cohn (Cohn, Emily)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/17/21 that by December 1, 2021, the defendant file and serve the certified administrative record; by January 10, 2022, the plaintiff file a brief setting forth the specific errors allegedly committed at the administrative level which entitle the plaintiff to relief and stating the relief sought; by February 22, 2022, the defendant file a brief which responds specifically to each error raised by the plaintiff; and by March 9, 2022, plaintiff may file a brief which replies to the matters raised in the defendants brief. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Sevice (Marvin, Cody)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Laura B Van Dynhoven. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Marvin, Cody)
August 12, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Laura Van Dynhoven. (Marvin, Cody)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Laura Van Dynhoven ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3891484) (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marvin, Cody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Dynhoven v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Van Dynhoven
Represented By: Cody T Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura B Van Dynhoven
Represented By: Cody T Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Emily Skutch Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?