Hasan v. State of Wisconsin et al
Plaintiff: Denny Hasan
Defendant: State of Wisconsin, Department of Corrections Probation and Parole and Sharon Purifoy
Case Number: 1:2021cv00971
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 JUDGMENT entered by Deputy Clerk; approved by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/1/2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(tlf)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/1/2021 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice because Hasan's claim is barred by Heck v. Humphrey. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party and Warden)(Griesbach, William)
September 29, 2021 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $10.47, receipt number GB4689-5877. The payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (mac)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that on or before 10/4/2021 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 10.47 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 9/2/2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party and warden)(Griesbach, William)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Denny Hasan. (jcl)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Denny Hasan. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (jcl)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address as to Denny Hasan (cmb)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from the Clerk to Denny Hasan regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from the Clerk to Denny Hasan directing him to submit signed copies of the #1 Prisoner Complaint and #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee within 21 days. (cc: All Counsel) (tlf)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. Mailed. (cmb)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 UNSIGNED MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Denny Hasan. (cmb)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 UNSIGNED PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against All Defendants by Denny Hasan. (cmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hasan v. State of Wisconsin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denny Hasan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections Probation and Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Purifoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?