Stephens et al v. Meijer Stores Limited Partnership
Plaintiff: Julie M Stephens, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Humana Insurance Company and UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc
Defendant: Meijer Stores Limited Partnership and ABC Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01160
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. (Andrews, Eric) Modified on 12/3/2021 (tlf).
November 29, 2021 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 11/29/2021. Counsel instructed to file an Amended Notice of Removal addressing jurisdiction. Telephone Scheduling/Status Conference set for 12/21/2021 09:30 AM in by Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #112921) (lh)
November 29, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)Telephone Scheduling/Status Conference set for 12/21/2021 09:30 AM in by Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov.(lh)
November 18, 2021 Filing 19 LETTER from Matthew Falk Requesting Non-Appearance. (Falk, Matthew)
November 16, 2021 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: (cc: all counsel)Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference originally scheduled for 11/19/21 is RESCHEDULED for 11/29/2021 10:00 AM in by Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov.(lh)
November 11, 2021 Filing 18 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. (Andrews, Eric)
November 10, 2021 Filing 17 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Crossclaim of Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation filed by Julie M Stephens. (Papendorf, Jarrod)
November 4, 2021 Filing 16 LETTER from Matthew Falk Requesting Non-Appearance. (Falk, Matthew)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER GRANTING #12 Joint Motion for Protective Order, filed by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/25/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 22, 2021 Filing 14 Defendant Meijer Stores Limited Partnership's ANSWER to Crossclaim re #7 filed by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. (Andrews, Eric)
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P Beisenstein on behalf of Julie M Stephens. Attorney(s) appearing: Brian P. Beisenstein (Beisenstein, Brian)
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order)(Andrews, Eric)
October 22, 2021 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Andrews, Eric)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Humana Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Falk, Matthew)
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by Humana Insurance Company. (Falk, Matthew)
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Humana Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Falk, Matthew) Modified on 10/21/2021 (tlf).
October 21, 2021 Filing 7 Humana's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Humana Insurance Company. by Humana Insurance Company.(Falk, Matthew)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Robert Falk on behalf of Humana Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew R. Falk (Falk, Matthew)
October 21, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #8 Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. This document must contain the name of the assigned magistrate judge (Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph). This document must be RE-FILED. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (tlf)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership.(Andrews, Eric)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. (Andrews, Eric)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren E Buliox on behalf of Meijer Stores Limited Partnership. Attorney(s) appearing: Warren E. Buliox (Buliox, Warren)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2021 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Meijer Stores Limited Partnership from Outagamie County Circuit Court, Case Number: 21CV681 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3941522) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Eric)
October 7, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens et al v. Meijer Stores Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie M Stephens
Represented By: Jarrod J Papendorf
Represented By: Brian P Beisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humana Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Robert Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijer Stores Limited Partnership
Represented By: Warren E Buliox
Represented By: Eric L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?