Babiash v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Mark S Babiash
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv01291
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Mark S Babiash signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 12/17/2021. Case reopened. The Clerk is directed to serve the defendant. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(Griesbach, William)
December 17, 2021 Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (tlf)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Reopen Case by Mark S Babiash. (cav)
December 16, 2021 FILING FEE Received: $402.00, receipt number GB4689-5899. (cav)
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Judge William C Griesbach on 12/14/2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(cav)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 12/14/2021 dismissing this case without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(Griesbach, William)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 11/17/2021 denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee on or before 12/8/2021. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(Griesbach, William)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT by Mark S Babiash re #1 Complaint - Social Security. (lh)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Mark S Babiash. (mac)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Mark S Babiash. Consent forms distributed to the parties for Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babiash v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark S Babiash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?