Wisconsin Family Action v. Federal Election Commission
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Family Action
Defendant: Federal Election Commission
Amicus Curiae: Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv01373
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel E Snyder on behalf of Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: Rachel E. Snyder (Snyder, Rachel)
January 21, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Carly Gerads on behalf of Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: Carly Gerads (Gerads, Carly)
January 21, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M Poland on behalf of Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: Douglas M. Poland (Poland, Douglas)
January 21, 2022 Filing 24 DISCLOSURE Statement by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Inc.. (Mandell, Jeffrey)
January 21, 2022 Filing 23 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Inc. re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #12 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Expedite Disposition of Preliminary Injunction Motion . (Mandell, Jeffrey)
January 21, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A Mandell on behalf of Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey A. Mandell (Mandell, Jeffrey)
January 14, 2022 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Jayci A. Sadio (Attachments: #1 Exh. A, I.E. Table 2015-2016, #2 Exh. B, I.E. Table 2019-2020, #3 Exh. C, Candidate Table 2019-2021, #4 Exh. D, Wis. Family PAC State Report, #5 Exh. E, State Reports, #6 Exh. F, House District 06, #7 Exh. G, House District 07, #8 Exh. H, Wisconsin Family Action, #9 Exh. I, Congratulations to WFA PAC Endorsed Candidates, Feb 17, 2021, #10 Press Release, Apr. 7, 2021, #11 Exh. K, Outside Spending, #12 Exh. L, Rulemaking Comments)(Mueller, Greg)
January 14, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Federal Election Commission re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Unpublished decision in Bergeron Davila v. Schmaling, No. 16-1655 (E.D. Wis. May 24, 2017)., #2 Unpublished decision in Gill v. Wisconsin Dept. of Corr., No. 20-974 (E.D. Wis. Nov. 3, 2020).)(Mueller, Greg)
January 14, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg J Mueller on behalf of Federal Election Commission. Attorney(s) appearing: Greg J. Mueller (Mueller, Greg)
January 5, 2022 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Conference held on 1/5/2022. Oral Argument Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 2/8/2022 01:30 PM before Judge William C Griesbach, if necessary. (Tape #010522) (mac)
January 5, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing: Oral Argument Hearing on Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 2/8/2022 at 01:30 PM (CT) before Judge William C Griesbach via Zoom Video Conference, if necessary. Counsel are to notify any interested parties and provide the Zoom Video Conference information to them. Counsel shall contact the Office of the Clerk at least 24 hours prior to the hearing if interested parties wish to listen to the court proceeding. Members of the public, or media may contact the Office of the Clerk at least 24 hours prior to the hearing at 920-455-7381 if they wish to listen to the court proceeding. (cc: all counsel; Zoom invite emailed to all parties)(mac)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Adopting #16 Stipulation for Briefing Schedule, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 12/30/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
December 30, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Federal Election Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siler, Jacob)
December 30, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob S Siler on behalf of Federal Election Commission. Attorney(s) appearing: Jacob S. Siler (Siler, Jacob)
December 22, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)ATT Telephone Conference set for 1/5/2022 10:00 AM (CT) in by Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. Instructions: Participants are to call in to 1-888-273-3658, using Access Code 4416978, and Security Code 1234. Please be sure to call in prior to the time that the hearing is scheduled to begin so that there is no disruption to the court proceeding. To ensure a clear record of the hearing, participants should not use a speaker phone. Unless otherwise excused, all participants are expected to remain on the call for the duration of the conference. All participants are to confirm their appearance with the Clerk prior to the date of the hearing. Verification of your participation should be sent to wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (Notice emailed to L. Stevenson, K. Deeley, H. Summers, S. Nesin and S. Knepel)(lh)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 12/22/2021. The clerk is directed to set this matter on the Court's calendar for a telephone conference to address further proceedings. Notice of the telephone conference should be sent to the FEC attorneys listed in paragraph five of WFA's motion for expedited disposition as well as the U.S. Attorney. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
December 21, 2021 Filing 12 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Expedite Disposition of Preliminary Injunction Motion by Wisconsin Family Action. (Daugherty, Donald)
December 21, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. US Attorney's Office served on 12/8/2021. (Daugherty, Donald)
December 21, 2021 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by All Plaintiffs. (Daugherty, Donald) Documents mailed to US Attorney General on 12/8/2021 (tlf).
December 17, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wisconsin Family Action. Federal Election Commission served on 12/9/2021. (tlf)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 INCORRECT EVENT CHOSEN; See #9 Summons Returned Executed. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Daugherty, Donald) Modified on 12/17/2021 (tlf).
December 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D Dean on behalf of Wisconsin Family Action. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael D. Dean (Dean, Michael)
December 2, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support filed by Wisconsin Family Action re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Authority)(Daugherty, Donald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2021: #2 Corrected Page 1 correcting spelling of Defendant's name) (tlf).
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Donald A. Daugherty, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Petition to FEC, #2 Exhibit B FEC Press Release 10.04.18, #3 Exhibit C CREW Press Release 08.21.20, #4 Exhibit D FEC Reporting Instructions)(Daugherty, Donald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2021: #5 Corrected Page 1 correcting spelling of Defendant's name) (tlf).
December 2, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Julaine Appling (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FB Posts)(Daugherty, Donald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2021: #2 Corrected Page 1 correcting spelling of Defendant's name) (tlf).
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Wisconsin Family Action. (Daugherty, Donald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2021: #1 Corrected Page 1 correcting spelling of Defendant's name) (tlf).
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Daugherty, Donald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2021: #1 Corrected Page 1 correcting spelling of Defendant's name) (tlf).
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Wisconsin Family Action. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3985966) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Petition to FEC, #2 Exhibit B FEC Press Release 10.04.18, #3 Exhibit C CREW Press Release 08.21.20, #4 Exhibit D FEC Reporting Instructions, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Daugherty, Donald)
December 2, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
December 2, 2021 Summons Issued as to Federal Election Commission. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisconsin Family Action v. Federal Election Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin Family Action
Represented By: Michael D Dean
Represented By: Donald A Daugherty, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Election Commission
Represented By: Greg J Mueller
Represented By: Jacob S Siler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington Inc
Represented By: Carly Gerads
Represented By: Douglas M Poland
Represented By: Jeffrey A Mandell
Represented By: Rachel E Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?