Martin v. Forest County et al
Plaintiff: Ky D Martin
Defendant: Forest County, Langlade County, Darrell Wilson, Thomas Robinson, Tony Crum, Travis Krueger and Kevin Ison
Case Number: 1:2021cv01481
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 2/11/2022. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
February 10, 2022 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 2/10/2022. Discovery due by 2/3/2023, Motions due by 3/1/2023, Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 3/15/2022, Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2023 01:30 PM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. Jury Trial set for 9/11/2023 08:30 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #021022) (cav)
January 27, 2022 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan Joint Preliminary PRETRIAL REPORT by Tony Crum, Forest County, Kevin Ison, Travis Krueger, Langlade County, Thomas Robinson, Darrell Wilson. (Smith, Andrew) Modified on 1/28/2022 (tlf).
January 17, 2022 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Miller, James)
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants Serving, by USPS, Answer and Affirmative Defenses on plaintiff's counsel (Smith, Andrew)
January 4, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Smith, Andrew)
December 30, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants Serving Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form on plaintiff's attorney (Smith, Andrew)
December 30, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Smith, Andrew)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2022 09:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) Report due 2/3/2022. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: defendants' counsel and via email to plaintiff's counsel)(tlf)
December 30, 2021 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. All parties have been modified to remove addresses. Please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website and search for existing party names prior to creating a new party. The description of the attachments to the notice of removal contains duplicate text. Most documents on the drop-down list do not need further description. If you want to add a description, do not retype the same words into the description box. For example, if you choose Summons from the drop-down list then you may use the description box to the type in the name of the party to whom the summons is directed but you do not need to type the word summons. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (tlf)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants Serving Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Appearance, and Disclosure Statement on Attorney James Miller, attorney for plaintiff (Smith, Andrew)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Smith, Andrew)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P Smith on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew P Smith (Smith, Andrew)
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER from regarding Admission and ECF registration to James D. Miller (sent via USPS) (jcl)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Travis Krueger, Darrell Wilson, Kevin Ison, Langlade County, Forest County, Thomas Robinson, Tony Crum from Langlade County Circuit Court, Case Number: 21CV106 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4006587) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint Summons and Complaint)(Smith, Andrew)
December 29, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Forest County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ky D Martin
Represented By: James D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest County
Represented By: Andrew P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Langlade County
Represented By: Andrew P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Wilson
Represented By: Andrew P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Robinson
Represented By: Andrew P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Crum
Represented By: Andrew P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Krueger
Represented By: Andrew P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Ison
Represented By: Andrew P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?