Smith v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Wayne A Smith
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2022cv00059
Filed: January 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Skutch Cohn on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. Attorney(s) appearing: Emily S. Cohn (Cohn, Emily)
February 15, 2022 Filing 7 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by April 18, 2022;Plaintiff's brief due May 31, 2022;Defendant's response due July 11, 2022;Plaintiff's reply due July 26, 2022. (cc: all counsel) (blr)
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Wayne A Smith served upon Attorney General; Regional Chief; U.S. Attorney on 2/2/22;2/1/22;1/31/22 (Duncan, Dana)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 2/3/2022. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
February 3, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
January 18, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Wayne A Smith. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Duncan, Dana)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Wayne A Smith. (Duncan, Dana)
January 18, 2022 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Wayne A Smith ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4020095) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duncan, Dana)
January 18, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne A Smith
Represented By: Dana W Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Emily Skutch Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?