United Natural Foods Inc et al v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 662
Plaintiff: United Natural Foods, Inc., SUPERVALU INC., United Natural Foods Inc and Supervalu Inc
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 662
Case Number: 1:2022cv00075
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by SUPERVALU INC, United Natural Foods Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Yellin, Michael)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S Yellin on behalf of SUPERVALU INC, United Natural Foods Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael Yellin (Yellin, Michael)
January 26, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 662 - Waiver sent on 1/25/2022. (Levine, Jonathan)
January 21, 2022 Summons Issued as to International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 662. (mac)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by SUPERVALU INC., United Natural Foods, Inc.. (Levine, Jonathan)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 662 by United Natural Foods, Inc., SUPERVALU INC.. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4022567) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBA with Local 662, #2 Exhibit B - CBA with Local 414, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons for Local 662)(Levine, Jonathan)
January 20, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Natural Foods Inc et al v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 662
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Natural Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan O Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUPERVALU INC.
Represented By: Jonathan O Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Natural Foods Inc
Represented By: Michael S Yellin
Represented By: Jonathan O Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supervalu Inc
Represented By: Michael S Yellin
Represented By: Jonathan O Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local 662
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?