Wausau General Insurance Company v. Gree USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Wausau General Insurance Company, as subrogee of Michael and Stacy Beck, Michael Beck, Stacy Beck and Wausau General Insurance Company
Defendant: Gree USA Inc and MJC America Ltd
Case Number: 1:2022cv00540
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 6/30/22. Amended Pleadings due by 5/2/2023, Discovery due by 5/17/2023, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 1/6/2023, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 2/16/2023, Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2023, Initial Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 7/29/2022. All non-dispositive motions (other than motions in limine) due by 6/12/2023. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
June 30, 2022 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing (cc: all counsel) The Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference scheduled for 7/5/22 at 10:30 AM is REMOVED from the Court's calendar. A scheduling order will be issued. (lh)
June 7, 2022 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Wausau General Insurance Company. (Saber, Marisa)
May 27, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis J Rhoades on behalf of Gree USA Inc, MJC America Ltd. Attorney(s) appearing: Travis J. Rhoades (Rhoades, Travis)
May 27, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel) Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/5/2022 10:30 AM in by Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(lh)
May 26, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcella Spoto on behalf of Gree USA Inc, MJC America Ltd. Attorney(s) appearing: Marcella Spoto (Spoto, Marcella) Modified attorney appearance name on 5/27/2022 (lh).
May 26, 2022 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Gree USA Inc, MJC America Ltd.(Spoto, Marcella)
May 25, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Wausau General Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Saber, Marisa)
May 18, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wausau General Insurance Company. MJC America Ltd served on 5/9/2022 5/17/2022. (Saber, Marisa) Modified on 5/18/2022 (tlf).
May 18, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wausau General Insurance Company. Gree USA Inc served on 5/9/2022 5/12/2022. (Saber, Marisa) Modified on 5/18/2022 (tlf).
May 18, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines. (tlf)
May 12, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Wausau General Insurance Company. (Saber, Marisa)
May 6, 2022 Summons Issued as to Gree USA Inc, MJC America Ltd. (tlf)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Gree USA Inc and MJC America LTD by Wausau General Insurance Company, as subrogee of Michael and Stacy Beck. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4107508) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gree Recall, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Gree USA, #4 Summons MJC America Ltd.)(Saber, Marisa) Modified text on 5/5/2022 (lh).
May 5, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wausau General Insurance Company v. Gree USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wausau General Insurance Company, as subrogee of Michael and Stacy Beck
Represented By: Marisa Lynn Saber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wausau General Insurance Company
Represented By: Marisa Lynn Saber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA Inc
Represented By: Marcella Spoto
Represented By: Travis J Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America Ltd
Represented By: Marcella Spoto
Represented By: Travis J Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?