Abdulhadi Sfaie Al Abdulrahman v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Asawir Abdulhadi Sfaie Al Abdulrahman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv00768
Filed: July 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript and Preservation of Rights filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Transcript, #2 Transcript, #3 Transcript, #4 Transcript, #5 Transcript, #6 Transcript, #7 Transcript, #8 Transcript, #9 Transcript, #10 Transcript) (Pawlak, Brian)
August 26, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (Pawlak, Brian)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 7/11/22. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries for all further proceedings. Judge Brett H Ludwig no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
July 8, 2022 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Establishing Appeal Procedure signed by Judge Brett H. Ludwig on 7/6/2022. Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 9/6/22;Plaintiff's brief due 10/17/22;Defendant's response due 11/28/22;Plaintiff's reply due 12/13/22. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
July 7, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Asawir Abdulhadi Sfaie Al Abdulrahman. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Skaar, Daniel)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 7/7/22 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
July 7, 2022 SERVICE OF COMPLAINT - Pursuant to the #Eastern District of Wisconsin's Memorandum of Understanding, the Commissioner and U.S. Attorney's Office have been electronically served with the Social Security appeal via CM/ECF. NOTICE to Plaintiff - Service on the Commissioner in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the Commissioner requests otherwise. (asc)
July 6, 2022 Filing 3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Asawir Abdulhadi Sfaie Al Abdulrahman. (Skaar, Daniel)
July 6, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Asawir Abdulhadi Sfaie Al Abdulrahman. (Skaar, Daniel)
July 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Asawir Abdulhadi Sfaie Al Abdulrahman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Unfavorable Notice of Decision, #3 Appeals Council Denial, #4 Appeals Council Extension)(Skaar, Daniel)
July 6, 2022 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdulhadi Sfaie Al Abdulrahman v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asawir Abdulhadi Sfaie Al Abdulrahman
Represented By: Daniel A Skaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?