Williams v. City of Appleton et al
Plaintiff: Tavion Williams
Defendant: City of Appleton, John Ostermeier and Aaron Pynenberg
Case Number: 1:2023cv00045
Filed: January 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE from the clerk to Atty Emilia Janisch requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. In addition, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (jmk)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori M Lubinsky on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Lori M. Lubinsky (Lubinsky, Lori) (Main Document 9 replaced with corrected document on 3/10/2023) (jmk).
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by All Defendants.(Janisch, Emilia)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Emilia R Janisch on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Emilia R. Janisch (Janisch, Emilia) (Main Document 7 replaced with corrected document on 3/10/2023) (jmk).
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Defendants. Waiver issued on 1/13/2023. (Bradley, John)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Randal Richard Resch, II on behalf of Tavion Williams. Attorney(s) appearing: Randal Richard Resch (Resch, Randal)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James Odell on behalf of Tavion Williams. Attorney(s) appearing: James Odell (Odell, James)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Tavion Williams. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Bradley, John)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Tavion Williams. (Bradley, John)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Tavion Williams. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4299360) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bradley, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. City of Appleton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tavion Williams
Represented By: John H Bradley
Represented By: James Odell
Represented By: Randal Richard Resch, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Appleton
Represented By: Emilia R Janisch
Represented By: Lori M Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ostermeier
Represented By: Emilia R Janisch
Represented By: Lori M Lubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Pynenberg
Represented By: Lori M Lubinsky
Represented By: Emilia R Janisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?