Alvarenga v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: John Alvarenga
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2023cv00057
Filed: January 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript and Preservation of Rights filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Transcript, #2 Transcript, #3 Transcript, #4 Transcript, #5 Transcript, #6 Transcript, #7 Transcript, #8 Transcript) (Pawlak, Brian)
March 15, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Commissioner of Social Security (Pawlak, Brian)
February 23, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Marie Godfrey on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney(s) appearing: Jean Godfrey (Godfrey, Jean)
January 29, 2023 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by John Alvarenga. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Chermol, David)
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
January 17, 2023 Notice of Service - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has electronically notified via CM/ECF the appropriate Regional Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. (asc)
January 15, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb)
January 15, 2023 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by John Alvarenga ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4301554) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Chermol, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarenga v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Alvarenga
Represented By: David F Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Jean Marie Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?