Boyd v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Richard A Boyd, Jr
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2023cv01202
Filed: September 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Han, Lu)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/19/2023. Within 60 days of Clerk's Office notification of suit via CM/ECF, Defendant to FILE the transcript of administrative proceedings. Within 15 days of the filing of the transcript, the parties to meet and confer in a good faith effort to resolve the matter. Plaintiff's brief due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript; Defendant's response due within 30 days of the filing of Plaintiff's brief; Plaintiff's reply due within 14 days of the filing of Defendant's response. Briefs are subject to specified page limitations. No extensions of time for filing of briefs will be granted. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
October 16, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lu Han on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. Attorney(s) appearing: Lu Han (Han, Lu)
September 13, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Richard A Boyd, Jr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Chewning, Donald)
September 13, 2023 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 13, 2023 Notice of Service - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has electronically notified via CM/ECF the Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. (asc)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 9/12/2023 GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
September 11, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Richard A Boyd, Jr. (Chewning, Donald)
September 11, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Richard A Boyd, Jr. (Chewning, Donald)
September 11, 2023 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Richard A Boyd, Jr (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appeals Council denial, #3 ALJ decision)(Chewning, Donald)
September 11, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A Boyd, Jr
Represented By: Donald J Chewning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: SSA - Office of the General Counsel
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Lu Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?