Mommaerts v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Shane M Mommaerts
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2023cv01248
Filed: September 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries for all further proceedings. Judge William C Griesbach no longer assigned to case signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 9/28/23. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Shane M Mommaerts. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Duncan, Dana)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 11/24/2023. (cc: all counsel) (kwf)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 9/25/2023 GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. The clerk shall serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the Commissioner of Social Security. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Notice of Service - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has electronically notified via CM/ECF the Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. (kwf)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (asc)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Shane M Mommaerts. (Duncan, Dana)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Shane M Mommaerts. (Duncan, Dana)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Shane M Mommaerts (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duncan, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mommaerts v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane M Mommaerts
Represented By: Dana W Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: SSA - Office of the General Counsel
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?