Baran v. Dodge County Detention Facility
Plaintiff: Steven M Baran
Defendant: Dodge County Detention Facility
Case Number: 1:2023cv01258
Filed: September 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Green Bay Office
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 Filing 11 LETTER from Steven M. Baran. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jmk)
October 10, 2023 Filing 10 LETTER from Steven M. Baran. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmk)
October 4, 2023 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS by Steven M Baran to case being transferred to the Eastern District of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jmk)
October 2, 2023 Filing 8 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/2/2023. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party) (jmk)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/2/2023. This action is DISMISSED because Barans letter does not comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 and because Baran did not pay the civil case filing fee. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(Griesbach, William)
September 25, 2023 Filing 6 LETTER from the clerk to Steven M. Baran re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting payment of the full filing fee or that a petition to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee and six-month certified trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (lh)
September 22, 2023 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:23-cv-12144. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 22, 2023 Filing 4 Case transferred to to District of Eastern District of Wisconsin;. Case File Electronically Transferred to the Clerk in that District on September 22, 2023. (Dore, Samantha) [Transferred from mad on 9/22/2023.]
September 22, 2023 Filing 3 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. (PSSA, 5) [Transferred from mad on 9/22/2023.]
September 22, 2023 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (bx)
September 20, 2023 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Phillips, Sophie) [Transferred from mad on 9/22/2023.]
September 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dodge County Detention Facility,, filed by Steven M Baran. (Attachments: #1 Supplement In Support, #2 envelope)(Castilla, Francis) [Transferred from mad on 9/22/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baran v. Dodge County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M Baran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodge County Detention Facility
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?