Alnabulsi v. Racine County Jail
Plaintiff: Mohammad Alnabulsi and Mohammad Tarek Alnabulsi
Defendant: Racine County Jail
Case Number: 1:2024cv00303
Filed: March 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 4/24/24. Alnabulsi's #2 MOTION for leave to proceed informa pauperis is GRANTED. On or before, 5/24/24, Alnabulsi may file an amended complaint if he believes he can cure the defects in the original complaint as described in this decision. If he cannot, he need not take any further action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to office in charge and pro se party (with form) (Griesbach, William)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER from Mohammad Alnabulsi regarding inability to obtain Trust Account Statement from the facility postmarked 4/19/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmk)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER, dated 4/15/2024, from Mohammad Alnabulsi regarding inability to obtain Trust Account statement from facility. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmk)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER from Plaintiff regarding Magistrate consent/refusal forms. (mac)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER from Plaintiff regarding trust account statement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mac)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 3/20/2024. If the Court does not receive the trust account statement or a thorough explanation of the specific challenges Plaintiff faces in arranging submission of the statement by April 19, 2024, the Court will deny Plaintiff's motion to proceed without prepaying the filing fee and will dismiss this action based on his failure to pay the filing fee. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party) (Griesbach, William)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk to Mohammad Alnabulsi regarding unsigned documents. (jmk)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Unsigned) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mohammad Alnabulsi. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (jmk)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER from Mohammad Alnabuls regarding Trust Account Statement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jmk)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Mohammad Alnabulsi re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (ams) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/8/2024) (ams).
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Mohammad Alnabulsi. (ams)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against Racine County Jail by Mohammad Alnabulsi. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alnabulsi v. Racine County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Alnabulsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Tarek Alnabulsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Racine County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?