Highway J Citizens Group et al v. United States Department of Transportation et al
Case Number: 2:2005cv00212
Filed: February 22, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/27/13 denying 206 plaintiffs motion to reopen and for preliminary injunction; denying as moot 212 defendants motion for a stay of briefing, status conference, and for related relief; denying 215 plaintiffs motion to enter judgment on their motion to reopen and for preliminary injunction. (cc: all counsel) (dm)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/23/10 denying 168 Motion for Reconsideration. (cc: all counsel) (Wesolek, Marie)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/14/09 granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 123 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 162 Motion for Order. Pursuant to the APA, the 3/ 6/02 ROD and the Corps's decision regarding the 2005 and 2006 wetland-fill permits are vacated, and the matter is remanded to the respective agencies. Telephonic status conference set for 10/29/09 at 10:30 a.m. The court will initiate the call. (cc: all counsel) (Wesolek, Marie)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER that plaintiffs' affidavits regarding standing due 6/5/09; defendants' response to plaintiffs' submissions due 6/12/09 signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/27/09. (cc: all counsel)(Wesolek, Marie)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Highway J Citizens Group et al v. United States Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?