Jones v. International Association of Bridge Structural Ornamental and Reinforcing Iron Workers et al
Plaintiff: Ricky Jones
Defendant: International Association of Bridge Structural Ornamental and Reinforcing Iron Workers, International Association of Bridge Structural Ornamental and Reinforcement Iron Workers Midwestern District Counsel, Iron Workers Local 8, Brad Cyganek, Colin Teska, Yancy Grawlen, Tim Roman, Tony Mayhrhofer, Brandon Day, Dennis Gustavson, Troy Moose, Randell Bryce, Tom Callen, Gilbert Toslek, William Fleming, Richard Hanson, Karen Morgan, Iron Worker Local 8 Health and Welfare Fund Board of Trustees and JP Cullen Construction Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv00560
Filed: July 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Patricia J Gorence
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 AMENDED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia J Gorence on 5/21/2012. The defendant Iron Worker Local 8 Health and Welfare Fund Board of Trustees 33 motion to dismiss is granted. Defendant Iron Worker Local 8 Health and Welfare Fund Board of Trustees is dismissed. (cc: all counsel, to Ricky Jones via USPS)(mlm)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia J Gorence on 5/15/2012. The plaintiffs motion for a continuance of the scheduling conference be and hereby is denied. (Docket #155). The telephone scheduling conference will take place as scheduled on Thursday May 17, 2012, at 3:00 p.m. The court will initiate the call. (cc: all counsel, to plaintiff via USPS) (mlm)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia J Gorence on 3/28/2012. International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental & Reinforcing Ironworkers, AFL-CIOs 18 motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part as stated her ein. Ironworkers District Council of North Central States 21 motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part as stated herein. Ironworkers Local 8 Health and Welfare Fund Board of Trustees 33 motion to dismiss is granted in part and de nied in part as stated herein. Ironworkers Local 8 and members of its Executive Board, Tom Cullen, Gilbert Toslek, William Fleming and Richard Hansons 30 motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part as stated herein. DWD Bureau of Ap prenticeship and Karen Morgans 47 motion to dismiss is granted. J.P. Cullen Construction Companys 60 motion to dismiss is denied. The plaintiffs WFEA, duty of fair representation, 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and 42 U.S.C. § 1985 claims are dismissed. Counts III and IV of the complaint are dismissed. The stay previously entered in this case be and hereby is lifted. (cc: all counsel, to plaintiff via USPS) (mlm)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia J Gorence on 10/19/11. The plaintiffs motion for reconsideration of the courts order denying his 4/11/2011, Motion for Recusal of Magistrate be and hereby is denied. (Docket #101). The defendants Internationa l Association of Bridge Structural Ornamental and Reinforcement Iron Workers Midwestern District Counsel and International Association of Bridge Structural Ornamental and Reinforcing Iron Workers motion to strike plaintiffs 7/29/2011, motion be and h ereby is denied. (Docket #94). The plaintiffs Motion to Have Petition For Interlocutory Appeal Copied form [sic] Response be and hereby is denied. (Docket #116) The plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal be and hereby is denied. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff via USPS) (mlm)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia J Gorence on 8/23/2011. The plaintiffs motion to strike be and hereby is denied. (Docket #83). The plaintiffs motion for a conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) be and hereby is denied. Docket #84). The plaintiffs motion for an order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 68 and 70 be and hereby is denied. (Docket #86). The plaintiffs motion for production of Milwaukee County Jail inmate phone records be and hereby is denied. (Docket #90). The case continues to be stayed pending the resolution of the defendants motions to dismiss. No further proceedings or filings will be permitted without leave of the court pending resolution of the motions.. (cc: all counsel, to Ricky Jones via USPS) (mlm)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia J Gorence on 6/21/11. The plaintiffs motion for reconsideration be and hereby is granted. (Docket #77). The plaintiff shall file his response to defendant Iron Worker Local 8 Health and Welfare F und Board of Trustees motion to stay further proceedings by 7/11/11. Defendant Iron Worker Local 8 Health and Welfare Fund Board of Trustees shall file a reply, if any, by 7/31/2011. The plaintiffs motion for recusal be and hereby is denied. (Docket #78). (cc: all counsel, to plaintiff via USPS) (mlm)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia J Gorence on 3/7/2011. The plaintiffs 9 motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction be and hereby is denied. The plaintiff's 52 motion to amend the complaint will be and here by is denied without prejudice. The plaintiffs 54 motion to appoint counsel be and hereby is denied. The plaintiffs 57 motion to compel discovery be and hereby is denied without prejudice. The plaintiffs 63 motion for judgment be and hereby is denied. The plaintiffs 71 motion for performance be and hereby is denied without prejudice. The defendant, Iron Worker Local 8 Health and Welfare Fund Board of Trustees 65 motion to stay further proceedings be and hereby is granted. No further proceedings or filings will be permitted without leave of the court pending resolution of the defendants motions to dismiss. (cc: all counsel, mailed to plaintiff via USPS) (mlm)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia J Gorence on 9/9/10. The plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis be and hereby is denied. The plaintiff shall pay the full filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order or the case will be dismissed. (cc: all counsel, copy of order mailed to plaintiff) (mlm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. International Association of Bridge Structural Ornamental and Reinforcing Iron Workers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Bridge Structural Ornamental and Reinforcing Iron Workers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Bridge Structural Ornamental and Reinforcement Iron Workers Midwestern District Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron Workers Local 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Cyganek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Teska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yancy Grawlen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Mayhrhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Gustavson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Moose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randell Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Callen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Toslek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iron Worker Local 8 Health and Welfare Fund Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Cullen Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?