City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System v. Bucyrus International Inc et al
Plaintiff: City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System
Defendant: Robert K Ortberg, Caterpillar Inc, Michelle L Collins, Deepak T Kapur, Robert C Scharp, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Gene E Little, Bucyrus International Inc, Timothy W Sullivan, Badger Merger Sub Inc and Paul W Jones
Petitioner: Thomas Turberg and Evelyn Greenberg
Case Number: 2:2010cv01106
Filed: December 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Charles N Clevert
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2014 EXHIBITS destroyed. No response to notification received. (cms)
September 17, 2014 Filing 86 NOTIFICATION of Exhibit Release sent to counsel of record. (cms)
November 29, 2011 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #85 Amended Complaint filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System ; This document was filed in the wrong case. Please REFILE the Amended Complaint in the Leadcase 10-cv-1104. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing found at www.wied.uscourts.gov and file all future documents in the Leadcase only. (kah)
November 28, 2011 Filing 85 DISREGARD; FILED IN WRONG CASE AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duties and Violations of sec. 14(a) and 20(a) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 with Jury Demand against Badger Merger Sub Inc, Bucyrus International Inc, Caterpillar Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System.(Wissbroecker, David) Modified on 11/29/2011 (kah).
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Dismissing Two Cases and Continuing Consolidation in Case No. 10-C-1104. Case Nos. 10-C-1103 and 10-C-1105 are severed from consolidation and dismissed. Case Nos. 10-C-1104, 10-C-1106 and 10-C-1179 remain consolidated in Case No. 10-C-1104. Parties shall file all documents in Case No. 10-C-1104. (cc: all counsel)((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr on 9/23/11 denying #17 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying as duplicative #26 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying without prejudice #39 Motion to Dismiss; granting #42 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying without prejudice #43 Motion to Dismiss; granting #74 Motion to Consolidate Cases; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all further filings shall be docketed in Case No. 10-C-1103. (cc: all counsel) (kah) Modified on 9/23/2011 (kah).
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Denying as Moot Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.'s Civil L.R. 7(H) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion to Consolidate Actions #11 . (cc: all counsel) ((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
July 15, 2011 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for discovery #20 is denied as moot. (cc: all counsel)((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
March 15, 2011 Filing 81 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Evelyn Greenberg, Thomas Turberg re #74 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Order (This Brief is in Support of the Motion to Consolidate Cases, and in Opposition to City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System's Motion to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff). (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Case)(Mather, Corey)
March 15, 2011 Filing 80 REFILED; SEE #81 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Thomas Turberg re #74 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Order (This Brief is in Support of the Motion to Consolidate Cases, and in Opposition to City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System's Motion to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff). (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Case)(Mather, Corey) Modified on 3/16/2011 (kah).
February 28, 2011 Filing 79 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Pollack, Howard)
February 28, 2011 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan Dkt#77 (Hernandez, Cristina)
February 28, 2011 Filing 77 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Hernandez, Cristina)
February 23, 2011 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #74 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System ; When filing motions which contain multiple parts the filer should select all applicable parts from the motion event list; This does not need to be refiled. Please refer to the user manuals on electronic case filing found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
February 22, 2011 Filing 76 DECLARATION of David T. Wissbroecker in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wissbroecker, David)
February 22, 2011 Filing 75 BRIEF in Support filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System re #74 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Cases)(Wissbroecker, David)
February 22, 2011 Filing 74 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wissbroecker, David). Added MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel on 2/23/2011 (kah).
February 18, 2011 Filing 73 TRANSCRIPT of Decision on Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on January 19, 2011 before Judge Charles N. Clevert, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heidi J. Trapp, Contact at 414-297-3074. Transcripts may be purchased through the court reporter using the Transcript Order Form found # here or viewed at the court public terminal. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: If necessary, within 7 business days each party shall inform the Court of their intent to redact personal identifiers by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact. Please read the policy located on our website # www.wied.uscourts.gov Redaction Statement due 3/11/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2011. (Trapp, Heidi)
February 18, 2011 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on January 18, 2011 before Judge Charles N. Clevert, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heidi J. Trapp, Contact at 414-297-3074. Transcripts may be purchased through the court reporter using the Transcript Order Form found # here or viewed at the court public terminal. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: If necessary, within 7 business days each party shall inform the Court of their intent to redact personal identifiers by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact. Please read the policy located on our website # www.wied.uscourts.gov Redaction Statement due 3/11/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2011. (Trapp, Heidi)
February 11, 2011 Filing 71 DECLARATION of David T. Wissbroecker in Opposition to the Bucyrus Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wissbroecker, David)
February 11, 2011 Filing 70 BRIEF in Opposition filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Opposition to the Bucyrus Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Case Authority)(Wissbroecker, David)
February 11, 2011 Filing 69 BRIEF in Opposition filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Opposition to Caterpillar Inc. and Badger Merger Sub, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Case Authority)(Wissbroecker, David)
January 31, 2011 Filing 68 EXHIBITS received for All Parties Exhibit list filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) (cms)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint until 2/11/11. (cc: all counsel)((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 26, 2011 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System [re Doc No. 65] (Wagner, K)
January 26, 2011 Filing 65 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint)(Wagner, K)
January 19, 2011 Filing 64 MINUTES. Court convened on 1/19/11. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is Denied. #47 An order shall be issued forthwith. (Court Reporter Heidi Trapp) ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #47 . (cc: all counsel) ((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 19, 2011 NOTICE to Parties in this Case and to Parties in Related Cases 10-C-1103, 10-C-1104, 10-C-1105 and 10-C-1179: Court will convene at 3:00 PM on 1/19/11 in Courtroom 222 to render an Oral Decision on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 19, 2011 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan Doc.# 59 (Hernandez, Cristina)
January 19, 2011 Filing 59 LETTER from Cristina D. Hernandez re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Hernandez, Cristina)
January 18, 2011 Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER. Court hears oral argument on 1/18/11 as to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and takes the matter under advisement. Counsel is to advise by 4:00 PM today on whether plaintiff(s) are able to post bond of at least $1,000,000.00. Plaintiff's Exhibits 1-12 (various proxy statements) are received into evidence. See separate filing. (Court Reporter Heidi Trapp) ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 18, 2011 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System (Condon, Jacques)
January 18, 2011 Filing 57 LETTER from Plaintiff City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement Systems. (Condon, Jacques)
January 18, 2011 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan Doc. #52 (Hernandez, Cristina)
January 18, 2011 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #54 Brief in Support of Motion filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System ; The incorrect event was chosen; Please refer to the user manuals on electronic case filing found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
January 17, 2011 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System for Memorandum of Law In Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction together with Exhibit and attachments (Condon, Jacques)
January 17, 2011 Filing 54 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System re #47 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , Supplemental Memorandum of Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Travis Keath, #2 Unpublished case authority)(Condon, Jacques) Modified event on 1/18/2011 (kah).
January 17, 2011 Filing 53 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc re #47 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Kirtley, John)
January 17, 2011 Filing 52 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan re #47 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Second Declaration of Cristina Hernandez in Opposition to Preliminary Injunction, #2 Affidavit Second Declaration of Amy Malingowski in Opposition to Preliminary Injunction, #3 Appendix Unpublished Cases Part I, #4 Appendix Unpubished Cases Part II)(Hernandez, Cristina)
January 12, 2011 Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER. Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/12/11. Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 1/18/11 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 222. See Minutes for additional information. (Court Reporter Sheryl Stawski) ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 12, 2011 NOTICE to Parties in this Case and to Parties in Related Cases 10-C-1103, 10-C-1104, 10-C-1105 and 10-C-1179: Telephonic Status Conference re Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 1/12/11 at 2:00 PM. Atty Condon to initiate conference call. ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 12, 2011 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan Doc. No. 50 (Hernandez, Cristina)
January 12, 2011 Filing 50 LETTER from The Bucyrus Defendants and supporting Declarations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Unpublished cases)(Hernandez, Cristina)
January 10, 2011 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System (Condon, Jacques)
January 10, 2011 Filing 48 BRIEF in Support filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System re #47 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 unpublished case authority)(Condon, Jacques)
January 10, 2011 Filing 47 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System. (Condon, Jacques)
January 4, 2011 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Evelyn Greenberg, Thomas Turberg re Doc No. 45 (Syrios, David)
January 4, 2011 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Evelyn Greenberg, Thomas Turberg re #42 MOTION to Consolidate Cases With the Four Actions Subject to Its Previous Consolidation Motion. (Syrios, David)
January 3, 2011 Filing 44 BRIEF in Support filed by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (Pollack, Howard)
January 3, 2011 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc. (Pollack, Howard)
January 3, 2011 Filing 42 MOTION to Consolidate Cases With the Four Actions Subject to Its Previous Consolidation Motion by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc. (Pollack, Howard)
January 3, 2011 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan Docket nos. 39 and 40 (Hernandez, Cristina)
January 3, 2011 Filing 40 BRIEF in Support filed by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Unpublished Decisions)(Hernandez, Cristina)
January 3, 2011 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan. (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 28, 2010 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan Docket No. 37 (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 28, 2010 Filing 37 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan re #20 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Discovery Directing Production of Discovery. (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 28, 2010 Filing 36 REPLY filed by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc re #20 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Discovery Directing Production of Discovery. (Pollack, Howard)
December 23, 2010 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System [re Doc No. 34] (Wagner, K)
December 23, 2010 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System Certificate of Named Plaintiff Pursuant to Federal Securities Law (Wagner, K)
December 23, 2010 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System [re Doc No. 32] (Wagner, K)
December 23, 2010 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Motion filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System re #17 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Appoint Counsel , Both Lead and Liaison, for the Class Plaintiff City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System's Response to Plaintiffs Greenberg's and Turberg's Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Case)(Wagner, K)
December 23, 2010 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 23, 2010 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Bucyrus International Inc, City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan re #11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispostive). (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 23, 2010 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System [re Doc Nos. 26-28] (Wagner, K)
December 23, 2010 Filing 28 DECLARATION of K. Scott Wagner in Support of Plaintiff City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System's Motion for the Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiff's Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kinder Morgan, #2 Exhibit B - ACS Shareholders, #3 Exhibit C - TD Banknorth, #4 Exhibit D - Chapparal Resources, #5 Exhibit E - Dollar General, #6 Exhibit F - Prime Hospitality, #7 Exhibit G - UnitedGlobalCom, #8 Exhibit H - eMachines, Inc., #9 Exhibit I - PETCO Animal Supplies, #10 Exhibit J - Fisch v. SSA Global, #11 Exhibit K - Pang v. Dwight, #12 Exhibit L - Robbins Geller firm resume, #13 Exhibit M - Prime Hospitality excepts, #14 Exhibit N - TD Banknorth excerpts, #15 Exhibit O - Hale & Wagner firm resume)(Wagner, K)
December 23, 2010 Filing 27 BRIEF in Support filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System re #26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for the Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiff's Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Cases)(Wagner, K)
December 23, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel for the Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiff's Counsel by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System's Motion for the Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiff's Counsel)(Wagner, K)
December 22, 2010 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System [re Doc No. 24] (Wagner, K)
December 22, 2010 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System re #11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispostive). (Wagner, K)
December 21, 2010 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System [re Doc Nos. 20-22 (Wagner, K)
December 21, 2010 Filing 22 PROPOSED Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Non-Dispositive Discovery filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System. (Wagner, K)
December 21, 2010 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System of Conference Pursuant to Civil L.R. 37 (Wagner, K)
December 21, 2010 Filing 20 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Discovery Directing Production of Discovery by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit unpublished cases)(Wagner, K)
December 20, 2010 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Evelyn Greenberg, Thomas Turberg re #11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispostive). (Syrios, David)
December 20, 2010 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Corey Mather in Support of Plaintiffs Evelyn Greenberg and Thomas Turberg's Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive Motion to Appoint Counsel, Both Lead and Liaison, for the Class. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Syrios, David)
December 20, 2010 Filing 17 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Appoint Counsel , Both Lead and Liaison, for the Class by Evelyn Greenberg, Thomas Turberg. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Syrios, David)
December 20, 2010 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System [re Doc #15] (Wagner, K)
December 20, 2010 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Breach of Fiduciary Duties and Violations of secs. 14(a) and 20(a) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System.(Wagner, K)
December 20, 2010 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System [re Doc #13] (Wagner, K)
December 20, 2010 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Statement by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System. (Wagner, K)
December 16, 2010 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc (Pollack, Howard)
December 16, 2010 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Civil L.R. 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispostive) by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc. (Pollack, Howard)
December 15, 2010 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan Docket No. 9 (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 15, 2010 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Cristina)
December 10, 2010 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr. Magistrate Judge William E Callahan, Jr no longer assigned to the case due to non consent. (cms)
December 9, 2010 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirment System [re: Doc No. 7] (Wagner, K)
December 9, 2010 Filing 7 Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirment System. (Wagner, K)
December 9, 2010 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc (And Filing of Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Pollack, Howard)
December 9, 2010 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan re: Docket Nos. 3 and 4 (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 9, 2010 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Bucyrus International Inc. (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 9, 2010 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines for further guidance (cms)
December 8, 2010 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Callahan, Jr ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Callahan to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our web site (jcl)
December 8, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristina D Hernandez on behalf of Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan. Attorney(s) appearing: Cristina D. Hernandez, Elizabeth C. Perkins, and Natalie G. Maciolek (Hernandez, Cristina)
December 8, 2010 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc. (Pollack, Howard)
December 8, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Caterpillar Inc, Badger Merger Sub Inc from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 10cv019868 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $350 receipt number 0757-1219325) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pollack, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System v. Bucyrus International Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Turberg
Represented By: David J Syrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Evelyn Greenberg
Represented By: David J Syrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K Ortberg
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: Matthew B Kilby
Represented By: Howard A Pollack
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: James W Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle L Collins
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepak T Kapur
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C Scharp
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Purdum
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore C Rogers
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene E Little
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bucyrus International Inc
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy W Sullivan
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badger Merger Sub Inc
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: Matthew B Kilby
Represented By: Howard A Pollack
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: James W Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul W Jones
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Represented By: Elizabeth C Perkins
Represented By: Natalie G Maciolek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Jacques C Condon
Represented By: Randall J Baron
Represented By: David T Wissbroecker
Represented By: Cullin A O'Brien
Represented By: Heather M Friedl
Represented By: Stuart A Davidson
Represented By: Michael J Vanoverbeke
Represented By: Thomas C Michaud
Represented By: A Rick Atwood, Jr
Represented By: K Scott Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?