Impens v. Sullivan et al
Plaintiff: Edmund J Impens
Defendant: Robert K Ortberg, Caterpillar Inc, Michelle L Collins, Deepak T Kapur, Robert C Scharp, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Gene E Little, Bucyrus International Inc, Timothy W Sullivan, Badger Merger Sub Inc and Paul W Jones
Petitioner: City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System, Thomas Turberg and Evelyn Greenberg
Case Number: 2:2010cv01179
Filed: December 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Charles N Clevert
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2011 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #27 Notice filed by Edmund J Impens ; This document should not have been filed in this case since these cases were consolidated and this is a member case. All filings should be in the LEADCASE 10-cv-1104. This must be REFILED in the correct case. Please make sure all future filings are in Case 10-cv-1104 only. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
November 3, 2011 Filing 27 DISREGARD; TO BE REFILED IN 10-CV-1104 NOTICE by Edmund J Impens Non-Opposition to Motion to Consolidate (Elliott, Robert) Modified on 11/4/2011 (kah).
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Dismissing Two Cases and Continuing Consolidation in Case No. 10-C-1104. Case Nos. 10-C-1103 and 10-C-1105 are severed from consolidation and dismissed. Case Nos. 10-C-1104, 10-C-1106 and 10-C-1179 remain consolidated in Case No. 10-C-1104. Parties shall file all documents in Case No. 10-C-1104. (cc: all counsel)((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Charles N Clevert, Jr on 9/23/11 granting #5 Motion to Consolidate Cases; denying without prejudice #16 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice #19 Motion to Dismiss; granting #21 Motion to Consolidate Cases; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all further filings shall be docketed in Case No. 10-C-1103. (cc: all counsel) (kah)
March 15, 2011 Filing 24 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Evelyn Greenberg, Thomas Turberg re #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff MOTION for Order (This Brief is in Support of the Motion to Consolidate Cases, and in Opposition to City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System's Motion to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff). (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Case)(Mather, Corey)
February 23, 2011 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System ; When filing motions which contain multiple parts the filer should select all applicable parts from the motion event list; This does not need to be refiled. Please refer to the user manuals on electronic case filing found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
February 22, 2011 Filing 23 DECLARATION of David T. Wissbroecker in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wissbroecker, David)
February 22, 2011 Filing 22 BRIEF in Support filed by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System re #21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Cases)(Wissbroecker, David)
February 22, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wissbroecker, David). Added MOTION for Approval of Selection of Counsel on 2/23/2011 (kah).
February 11, 2011 Filing 20 BRIEF in Support filed by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Impens's Complaint. (Pollack, Howard)
February 11, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Impens's Complaint by Badger Merger Sub Inc, Caterpillar Inc. (Pollack, Howard)
February 11, 2011 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan re: Docket Nos. 16 and 17 (Hernandez, Cristina)
February 11, 2011 Filing 17 BRIEF in Support filed by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan re #16 MOTION to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Unpublished Cases)(Hernandez, Cristina)
February 11, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan. (Hernandez, Cristina)
January 19, 2011 Filing 15 MINUTES. Court convened on 1/19/11. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is Denied. 47 An order shall be issued forthwith. (Court Reporter Heidi Trapp) ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #11 . (cc: all counsel)((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 19, 2011 NOTICE to Parties in this Case and to Parties in Related Cases 10-C-1103, 10-C-1104, 10-C-1105 and 10-C-1179: Court will convene at 3:00 PM on 1/19/11 in Courtroom 222 to render an Oral Decision on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 18, 2011 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER. Court hears oral argument on 1/18/11 as to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and takes the matter under advisement. Counsel is to advise by 4:00 PM today on whether plaintiff(s) are able to post bond of at least $1,000,000.00. Plaintiff's Exhibits 1-12 (various proxy statements) are received into evidence. See separate filing. (Court Reporter Heidi Trapp) ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 18, 2011 Filing 11 JOINDER by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Elliott, Robert)
January 12, 2011 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER. Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/12/11. Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 1/18/11 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 222. See Minutes for additional information. (Court Reporter Sheryl Stawski) ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 12, 2011 NOTICE to Parties in this Case and to Parties in Related Cases 10-C-1103, 10-C-1104, 10-C-1105 and 10-C-1179: Telephonic Status Conference re Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 1/12/11 at 2:00 PM. Atty Condon to initiate conference call. ((kwb), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (cc: all counsel)((cef), C. N. Clevert, Jr.)
January 5, 2011 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan Docket No. 8 (Hernandez, Cristina)
January 5, 2011 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Bucyrus International Inc, Michelle L Collins, Paul W Jones, Deepak T Kapur, Gene E Little, Robert K Ortberg, Robert L Purdum, Theodore C Rogers, Robert C Scharp, Timothy W Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez, Cristina)
January 4, 2011 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Evelyn Greenberg, Thomas Turberg re Doc No. 6 (Syrios, David)
January 4, 2011 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Evelyn Greenberg, Thomas Turberg re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases With the Four Actions Subject to Its Previous Consolidation Motion. (Syrios, David)
January 4, 2011 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (kah)
January 3, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases With the Four Actions Subject to Its Previous Consolidation Motion by Badger Merger Sub Inc. and Caterpillar Inc (Pollack, Howard) Modified on 1/4/2011 (mlm).
January 3, 2011 Filing 4 LETTER from Attorney Robert L. Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Elliott, Robert)
December 31, 2010 Filing 3 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Edmund J Impens. (Elliott, Robert)
December 30, 2010 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Edmund J Impens. (jcl)
December 30, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Edmund J Impens. ;Consent forms distributed to plaintiff for Magistrate Judge Callahan (Filing Fee PAID $350 receipt# MK4689022171) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Information Sheet)(jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Impens v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K Ortberg
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc
Represented By: Matthew B Kilby
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: Howard A Pollack
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: James W Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle L Collins
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepak T Kapur
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C Scharp
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Purdum
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore C Rogers
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene E Little
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bucyrus International Inc
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy W Sullivan
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badger Merger Sub Inc
Represented By: Matthew B Kilby
Represented By: Walter C Carlson
Represented By: Howard A Pollack
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: James W Ducayet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul W Jones
Represented By: Cristina D Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Sterling Heights Police & Fire Retirement System
Represented By: David T Wissbroecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Turberg
Represented By: Nadeem Faruqi
Represented By: Juan Monteverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Evelyn Greenberg
Represented By: James S Notis
Represented By: Corey Mather
Represented By: Mark C Gardy
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Represented By: David J Syrios
Represented By: Kelly A Noto
Represented By: Guri Ademi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund J Impens
Represented By: Robert L Elliott
Represented By: Eduard Korsinsky
Represented By: William Scott Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?