Johnson v. Milwaukee County Jail et al
Plaintiff: David Lee Johnson
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail, David Clark and Milwaukee County Sheriffs Department
Case Number: 2:2012cv01148
Filed: November 9, 2012
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 12/8/2017: DENYING 145 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and DENYING 146 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Judgment. (cc: all counsel, via mail to David Lee Johnson at Waupun Correctional Institution) (jm)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 11/8/2017 DENYING 139 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief From Judgment. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 8/26/15 granting 119 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and DISMISSING this matter with prejudice. See Order. (cc: Plaintiff, all counsel) (nm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Milwaukee County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?