Averkamp et al v. Swimways Corporation et al

Defendant: Target Corporation, CNA Foundation, Swimways Corporation and ACE American Insurance Company
Involuntary_plaintiff: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin
Plaintiff: Robert William Averkamp and Janice Averkamp
Case Number: 2:2013cv00473
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Milwaukee Office
County: Milwaukee
Presiding Judge: Rudolph T Randa
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 11/17/2014 GRANTING 34 Motion to Compel Depositions. By 12/4/2014 Swimways must make Rachel Lee, Danny Zhang, and Jerry Jiang available for deposition. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 18, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 9/18/2014 GRANTING 40 Swimways' Motion to Supplement. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
June 25, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 6/25/2013. On or before 7/19/2013 removing Defendants MUST FILE amended notice of removal (see Order for details). Failure to file by stated deadline will result in order remanding action without further notice. (cc: all counsel)(cb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Averkamp et al v. Swimways Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Stacy K Luell
Represented By: Jeffrey T Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Foundation
Represented By: Michael D Stotler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swimways Corporation
Represented By: Michael D Stotler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Stacy K Luell
Represented By: Jeffrey T Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Involuntary_plaintiff: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin
Represented By: Matthew Robert Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert William Averkamp
Represented By: Howard S Sicula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Averkamp
Represented By: Howard S Sicula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?